Narang Jt Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429034641217) was started on 19 Jul 2005. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 60 Mission Heights Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 (type: postal, office). Flat 1, 12 Miles Avenue, Papatoetoe, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 29 Apr 2015. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Tanu, Tanu (an individual) located at Flat Bush, Auckland postcode 2016,
Gopal, Jai (an individual) located at Flat Bush, Auckland postcode 2016. "House renting or leasing - except holiday house" (business classification L671140) is the classification the ABS issued Narang Jt Limited. Our data was updated on 07 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
60 Mission Heights Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 | Physical & registered & service | 29 Apr 2015 |
60 Mission Heights Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 | Office & delivery | 29 Apr 2019 |
60 Mission Heights Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 | Postal | 26 Apr 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Tanu Narang
Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016
Address used since 21 Apr 2015 |
Director | 19 Jul 2005 - current |
Jai Gopal
Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016
Address used since 21 Apr 2015 |
Director | 19 Jul 2005 - current |
Tanu Tanu
Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016
Address used since 21 Apr 2015 |
Director | 19 Jul 2005 - current |
60 Mission Heights Drive , Flat Bush , Auckland , 2016 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Flat 1, 12 Miles Avenue, Papatoetoe, Auckland, 2025 | Physical & registered | 22 May 2013 - 29 Apr 2015 |
1-12 Miles Avenue, Papatoetoe, Auckland, 1-12 Miles Avenue, Papatoetoe, Auckland | Registered & physical | 04 May 2006 - 22 May 2013 |
4/35 Wallace Road, Papatoetoe, Auckland | Registered & physical | 19 Jul 2005 - 04 May 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tanu, Tanu Individual |
Flat Bush Auckland 2016 |
19 Jul 2005 - current |
Gopal, Jai Individual |
Flat Bush Auckland 2016 |
19 Jul 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Popli, Meenakshi Individual |
Flat Bush Auckland 2016 |
13 Apr 2018 - 24 Oct 2019 |
Narang, Apoorv Individual |
Flat Bush Auckland 2016 |
13 Apr 2018 - 24 Oct 2019 |
Narang Impex NZ Limited 60 Mission Heights Drive |
|
Tanu Fashions Limited 60 Mission Heights Drive |
|
Intrepid Fortunes Limited 59 Mission Heights Drive |
|
Galaxy Class Limited 59 Mission Heights Drive |
|
Sovereign Class Limited 59 Mission Heights Drive |
|
Eternal Laxmi Limited 59 Mission Heights Drive |
Andy & Angie Limited 85 Argento Avenue |
Miki Developments Limited 1 Heidi Crescent |
Gdc2000 Development Limited 1 Ainwick Road |
Jsy Properties Limited 14 Karson Place |
Dutt Family Investments Limited 16 Frisken Road |
Franks Investments Limited 89 Sovereign Street |