Winchmore Estates Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429034565360) was launched on 01 Sep 2005. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 2/27 St Stephens Avenue, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 (type: delivery, postal). 2/27 St Stephens Avenue, Parnell 1052, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 28 Nov 2016. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 99 shares (99% of shares), namely:
Yiannakis, Yiannos (an individual) located at Parnell, Auckland. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Yiannakis, Yiannos (an individual) - located at Parnell, Auckland. "House renting or leasing - except holiday house" (ANZSIC L671140) is the classification the ABS issued to Winchmore Estates Limited. Our database was last updated on 23 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2/27 St Stephens Avenue, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered | 28 Nov 2016 |
2/27 St Stephens Avenue, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical & service | 13 Nov 2017 |
2/27 St Stephens Avenue, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Postal & office | 09 Nov 2019 |
2/27 St Stephens Avenue, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Delivery | 10 Nov 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Yiannos Yiannakis
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 04 Nov 2015 |
Director | 01 Sep 2005 - current |
Deanne Margaret Burt
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 04 Nov 2015 |
Director | 01 Sep 2005 - 07 Nov 2016 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
2/27 St Stephens Avenue, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Delivery | 10 Nov 2020 |
2/27 St Stephens Avenue , Parnell , Auckland , 1052 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
2/27 St Stephens Avenue, Parnell 1052, Auckland | Registered | 30 Oct 2008 - 28 Nov 2016 |
2/27, St Stephens Avenue, Parnell, Auckland 1052 | Physical | 30 Oct 2008 - 13 Nov 2017 |
Level 9, Customhouse, 50 Anzac Avenue, Auckland 1001 | Physical & registered | 01 Sep 2005 - 30 Oct 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Yiannakis, Yiannos Individual |
Parnell Auckland |
01 Sep 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Yiannakis, Yiannos Individual |
Parnell Auckland |
01 Sep 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Burt, Deanne Margaret Individual |
Parnell Auckland |
01 Sep 2005 - 07 Nov 2016 |
Schicker Holdings Limited 5/33 St Stephens Avenue |
|
Siena Capital Limited 2/26 St Stephens Avenue |
|
St Stephens Court Limited 15/26 St Stephens Ave |
|
International Relief Friendship Foundation Of New Zealand 24 St Stephens Avenue |
|
One World Crusade Inc 24 St Stephens Ave Parnell Auckland 1 |
|
Youth Federation For World Peace (new Zealand) 24 St Stephens Avenue |
Dwellinghouse Limited 37a Awatea Road |
Moody Developments Limited 31 Shore Road |
Edgar Properties Limited Suite 15, 8 Quay Street |
Freedommakers Limited 8d Melrose Street |
Number 70 Limited Level 1, 10 Eden Street |
Kelly Property Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |