Whitaker Family Trustees Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429034430088) was incorporated on 16 Nov 2005. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 95 Devonport Road, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 (type: registered, physical). 15 First Avenue, Tauranga had been their physical address, until 08 May 2017. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Bonney, Daryl Peter (an individual) located at Ohauiti, Tauranga postcode 3112. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 04 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
95 Devonport Road, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered & physical & service | 08 May 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Daryl Peter Bonney
Ohauiti, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 01 Jul 2014 |
Director | 16 Nov 2005 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
15 First Avenue, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & registered | 13 Jan 2010 - 08 May 2017 |
353 Devonport Road, Tauranga | Registered & physical | 16 Nov 2005 - 13 Jan 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bonney, Daryl Peter Individual |
Ohauiti Tauranga 3112 |
16 Nov 2005 - current |
Terin Trustees Limited 95 Devonport Road |
|
Broxy Rider Coaching Limited 95 Devonport Road |
|
Mangawhai Trustee No.1 Limited 95 Devonport Road |
|
Silver Kiwi Limited 95 Devonport Road |
|
Forever Now Limited 95 Devonport Road |
|
Priority Limited 95 Devonport Road |