The Fig and Olive Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429034365854) was incorporated on 02 Feb 2006. 11 addresess are currently in use by the company: 11 Lochinvar Lane, Rd 5, Taupo, 3385 (type: registered, service). 210 Wolseley Street, Mayfair, Hastings had been their registered address, up until 01 Dec 2023. The Fig and Olive Limited used other aliases, namely: Wine By Numbers Limited from 26 Aug 2011 to 17 Mar 2021, Origin Wines Limited (02 Feb 2006 to 26 Aug 2011). 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Reid, Robyn Mary (a director) located at Rd 5, Taupo postcode 3385. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Dragt, Ronald Oscar (a director) - located at Rd 5, Taupo. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 26 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
313 Dartmoor Road, Rd 6, Napier, 4186 | Physical & service | 02 Feb 2006 |
313 Dartmoor Road, R D 6, Napier, 4186 | Records & other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister | 26 Aug 2011 |
313 Dartmoor Road, Rd 6, Napier, 4186 | Registered | 05 Sep 2011 |
210 Wolseley Street, Mayfair, Hastings, 4122 | Records & shareregister | 28 Jun 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ronald Oscar Dragt
Rd 5, Taupo, 3385
Address used since 23 Nov 2023
Mayfair, Hastings, 4122
Address used since 28 Jun 2023
Rd 6, Napier, 4186
Address used since 30 Sep 2009 |
Director | 02 Feb 2006 - current |
Robyn Mary Reid
Rd 5, Taupo, 3385
Address used since 23 Nov 2023
Mayfair, Hastings, 4122
Address used since 28 Jun 2023
Rd 6, Napier, 4186
Address used since 30 Sep 2009 |
Director | 02 Feb 2006 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
210 Wolseley Street, Mayfair, Hastings, 4122 | Records & shareregister | 28 Jun 2023 |
11 Lochinvar Lane, Rd 5, Taupo, 3385 | Records & shareregister | 23 Nov 2023 |
11 Lochinvar Lane, Rd 5, Taupo, 3385 | Registered & service | 01 Dec 2023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
210 Wolseley Street, Mayfair, Hastings, 4122 | Registered & service | 06 Jul 2023 - 01 Dec 2023 |
313 Dartmoor Road, R D 6, Napier | Registered | 02 Feb 2006 - 05 Sep 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Reid, Robyn Mary Director |
Rd 5 Taupo 3385 |
03 Sep 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dragt, Ronald Oscar Director |
Rd 5 Taupo 3385 |
03 Sep 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dragt, Ronald Oscar Individual |
R D 6 Napier |
02 Feb 2006 - 26 Aug 2011 |
Dartmoor Road Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033449678 Company Number: 1933798 Entity |
R D 6 Napier 4186 |
26 Aug 2011 - 03 Sep 2020 |
Dartmoor Road Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033449678 Company Number: 1933798 Entity |
R D 6 Napier 4186 |
26 Aug 2011 - 03 Sep 2020 |
Reid, Robyn Mary Individual |
R D 6 Napier |
02 Feb 2006 - 26 Aug 2011 |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Dartmoor Road Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 1933798 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
313 Dartmoor Road Rd 6 Napier 4186 |
Kra Life Limited 313 Dartmoor Road |
|
Creative Design & Marketing Limited 313 Dartmoor Road |
|
Dartmoor Trustee Services Limited 313 Dartmoor Road |
|
Dartmoor Road Limited 313 Dartmoor Road |
|
The Great South Trading Company Limited 313 Dartmoor Road |
|
Pgk Consulting Limited 313 Dartmoor Road |