Rakon Pps Trustee Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429034182123) was started on 12 Apr 2006. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 8 Sylvia Park Road, Mt Wellington, Auckland, 1060 (type: physical, registered). One Pacific Rise, Mount Wellington, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 21 Sep 2009. 2 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (50% of shares), namely:
Witten, Lorraine Mary (an individual) located at Orakei, Auckland postcode 1071. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Oliver, Keith William (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Kerikeri. The Businesscheck information was updated on 28 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
8 Sylvia Park Road, Mt Wellington, Auckland, 1060 | Physical & registered & service | 21 Sep 2009 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Keith William Oliver
Kerikeri, 0294
Address used since 30 Mar 2021
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 23 Jan 2020 |
Director | 23 Jan 2020 - current |
Lorraine Mary Witten
Orakei, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 20 Dec 2022
Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 20 Jun 2022 |
Director | 20 Jun 2022 - current |
Bruce Robertson Irvine
Christchurch, 8052
Address used since 08 Aug 2013 |
Director | 12 Apr 2006 - 21 Jun 2022 |
Bryan William Mogridge
Waiheke Island, Auckland, 1081
Address used since 08 Aug 2013 |
Director | 12 Apr 2006 - 23 Jan 2020 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
One Pacific Rise, Mount Wellington, Auckland | Physical & registered | 12 Apr 2006 - 21 Sep 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Witten, Lorraine Mary Individual |
Orakei Auckland 1071 |
21 Jun 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Oliver, Keith William Individual |
Rd 1 Kerikeri 0294 |
14 Feb 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Irvine, Bruce Robertson Individual |
Christchurch |
12 Apr 2006 - 21 Jun 2022 |
Mogridge, Bryan William Individual |
Waiheke Island Auckland |
12 Apr 2006 - 14 Feb 2020 |
Gfc (warrior) Limited 8a Sylvia Park Road |
|
Renderplas Limited 8a Sylvia Park Road |
|
New Build Investments Limited 8a Sylvia Park Road |
|
Cascade Auto Finish Limited 8a Sylvia Park Road |
|
Rakija (whina) Limited 8a Sylvia Park Road |
|
General Construction (2010) Limited 8a Sylvia Park Road |