Tsr Eltham Limited (NZBN 9429034135693) was registered on 10 May 2006. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 139 Princes Street, Hawera, Hawera, 4610 (type: physical, registered). 139 Princes Street, Hawera had been their registered address, up to 08 Jul 2016. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Gavin, Ian Francis (an individual) located at Eltham, Eltham postcode 4322. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 28 Jun 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
139 Princes Street, Hawera, Hawera, 4610 | Physical & registered & service | 08 Jul 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ian Francis Gavin
Eltham, Eltham, 4322
Address used since 29 Jun 2015 |
Director | 01 Apr 2009 - current |
Eric James Marshall
Eltham,
Address used since 10 May 2006 |
Director | 10 May 2006 - 26 Aug 2013 |
Margaret Rose Marshall
Eltham,
Address used since 10 May 2006 |
Director | 10 May 2006 - 01 Apr 2009 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
139 Princes Street, Hawera, 4332 | Registered & physical | 22 Jul 2013 - 08 Jul 2016 |
250 Braodway, Stratford, 4332 | Physical & registered | 17 Jun 2011 - 22 Jul 2013 |
Brendan Mclean, C/-c F Schurr Chartered Accountants, Stanners Street, Eltham | Registered & physical | 10 May 2006 - 17 Jun 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gavin, Ian Francis Individual |
Eltham Eltham 4322 |
01 Apr 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Marshall, Eric James Individual |
Eltham |
10 May 2006 - 26 Aug 2013 |
Marshall, Margaret Rose Individual |
Eltham |
10 May 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Western Harvest Limited 139 Princes Street |
|
South Taranaki Plumbing Services Limited 139 Princes Street |
|
Tru-line Machinery Limited 139 Princes Street |
|
Tru-line Holdings Limited 139 Princes Street |
|
Urban Group (nz) Limited 139 Princes Street |
|
Weststone 2012 Limited 139 Princes Street |