Chrysalis Capital Partners Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429034074619) was started on 08 Jun 2006. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 56 Esplanade Road, Mt Eden, Auckland, 1024 (type: physical, service). 276 Remuera Road, Remuera, Auckland had been their registered address, until 21 Oct 2015. Chrysalis Capital Partners Limited used more aliases, namely: Capstone & Associates Limited from 08 Jun 2006 to 09 Feb 2007. 1000 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 499 shares (49.9 per cent of shares), namely:
The Esplanade Trust (an other) located at Mount Eden, Auckland postcode 1024,
Victoria St Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Auckland. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.1 per cent of all shares (1 share); it includes
Randall, William Brown Mcilvaine (an individual) - located at Remuera, Auckland. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 0.1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Coombe, Christopher Robert, located at Mt Eden, Auckland (an individual). "Business consultant service" (ANZSIC M696205) is the classification the ABS issued Chrysalis Capital Partners Limited. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
56 Esplanade Road, Mt Eden, Auckland, 1024 | Other (Address For Share Register) & records & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 13 Oct 2015 |
56 Esplanade Road, Mt Eden, Auckland, 1024 | Physical & service & registered | 21 Oct 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
William Brown Mcilvaine Randall
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 08 Jun 2006 |
Director | 08 Jun 2006 - current |
Christopher Robert Coombe
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 22 Oct 2009 |
Director | 08 Jun 2006 - current |
John Barry Bolland
Onehunga, Auckland,
Address used since 18 Jul 2006 |
Director | 18 Jul 2006 - 15 May 2008 |
56 Esplanade Road , Mt Eden , Auckland , 1024 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
276 Remuera Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Registered & physical | 08 Jun 2006 - 21 Oct 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
The Esplanade Trust Other (Other) |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
16 Nov 2011 - current |
Victoria St Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036574100 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Auckland |
08 Jun 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Randall, William Brown Mcilvaine Individual |
Remuera Auckland |
08 Jun 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Coombe, Christopher Robert Individual |
Mt Eden Auckland |
08 Jun 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sommerville Turst Other (Other) |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
16 Nov 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Allen-coombe, Nicola Frances Individual |
Mt Eden Auckland |
08 Jun 2006 - 16 Nov 2011 |
Relianz Consulting Limited 56 Esplanade Road |
|
South Pacific Clinical Trials Limited 25 Bellevue Road |
|
Ongoing Enterprises Limited 25 Bellevue Road |
|
Lagom Group Limited 27 Bellevue Road |
|
Waiheke Island International Jazz Festival Limited 41a Esplanade Road |
|
Lead Collective Limited Flat 1, 7 Bellevue Road |
Dean Group Limited 68 Esplanade Road |
Crystal Republic Limited 18 View Road |
Imxcloud Limited 20 View Road |
Multicare Limited 9 Lovelock Avenue |
Bright Partners Limited 7 Puka Street |
Wolfgramm Holdings Limited 9a/16 Esplanade Road |