Bg Capital Limited (NZBN 9429033967691) was started on 02 Aug 2006. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 2, 5-7 Kingdon Street, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (type: physical, service). 5-7 Kingdon Street, Level 4, Bupa House, Newmarket, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 28 Apr 2015. Bg Capital Limited used other names, namely: Ledge Company 05 Limited from 02 Aug 2006 to 16 Apr 2007. 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 99 shares (99% of shares), namely:
Philip Samuel Newland (an other) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050,
Bigio, David Robert (an individual) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Newland, Philip Samuel (an individual) - located at Remuera, Auckland. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 16 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 5-7 Kingdon Street, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & service & registered | 28 Apr 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Philip Samuel Newland
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 08 Jun 2011 |
Director | 01 Mar 2007 - current |
Alan Figgins
Manukau, Auckland,
Address used since 02 Aug 2006 |
Director | 02 Aug 2006 - 01 Mar 2007 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
5-7 Kingdon Street, Level 4, Bupa House, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical | 01 Feb 2013 - 28 Apr 2015 |
C/-kdb Business Advisory Ltd, Level 2, Orica House, 123 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical | 04 Jul 2012 - 01 Feb 2013 |
C/-kdb Business Services Ltd, Level 2, Orica House, 123 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered | 02 Jul 2012 - 04 Jul 2012 |
C/-kdb Chartered Accountants Limited, Level 2, 123 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland | Registered & physical | 06 Apr 2009 - 02 Jul 2012 |
118 Paritai Drive, Orakei, Auckland | Registered & physical | 23 Apr 2007 - 06 Apr 2009 |
C/-kdb Chartered Accountants, 16 Morgan Street, Newmarket, Auckland | Registered & physical | 02 Aug 2006 - 23 Apr 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Philip Samuel Newland Other (Other) |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
16 Apr 2007 - current |
Bigio, David Robert Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
26 Jun 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Newland, Philip Samuel Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
16 Apr 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Figgins, Alan Individual |
Manukau Auckland |
02 Aug 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Arnott's New Zealand Limited Level 1, 61-73 Davis Crescent |
|
Cornwall Trustees 73 Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
|
Cornwall Trustees 72 Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
|
Auckland Plumbers Group Limited Level 4, 19 Morgan Street |
|
Your Property Services Limited Level 4, 19 Morgan Street |
|
Grovers Investments Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |