Random World Media Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429033938707) was launched on 10 Aug 2006. 8 addresess are currently in use by the company: 5 O'connell Street, Auckland, Auckland, 1010 (type: service, registered). 71 Hutchinsons Road, Bucklands Beach, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 20 Feb 2017. Random World Media Limited used other aliases, namely: Ccubed Seminars Limited from 10 Aug 2006 to 24 Aug 2015. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Lockhart, Charlotte Anne (an individual) located at Oneroa, Waiheke Island postcode 1081. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Lockhart, John Peter William (an individual) - located at New Lynn, Auckland. "Film and video production" (ANZSIC J551110) is the category the ABS issued to Random World Media Limited. Our data was last updated on 30 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
218 Delamore Drive, Oneroa, Waiheke Island, 1081 | Physical & registered & service | 20 Feb 2017 |
Po Box 106683, Auckland City, Auckland, 1143 | Postal | 01 Aug 2019 |
Suite 1 Level 14, 191 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Office & delivery | 07 Sep 2020 |
5 O'connell Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Office | 05 Sep 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Charlotte Anne Lockhart
Oneroa, Waiheke Island, 1081
Address used since 10 Feb 2017 |
Director | 10 Aug 2006 - current |
John Peter William Lockhart
New Lynn, Auckland, 0600
Address used since 01 May 2023
East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013
Address used since 01 Mar 2019
Kelburn, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 01 Mar 2017 |
Director | 01 Mar 2017 - current |
Simon Richard Lockhart
Howick, Auckland,
Address used since 10 Aug 2006 |
Director | 10 Aug 2006 - 16 Jan 2008 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
5 O'connell Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Office | 05 Sep 2023 |
5 O'connell Street, Auckland, Auckland, 1010 | Service & registered | 13 Sep 2023 |
Suite 1 Level 14, 191 Queen Street , Auckland Central , Auckland , 1010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
71 Hutchinsons Road, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2014 | Physical & registered | 01 Sep 2015 - 20 Feb 2017 |
9 Burford Place, Howick, Auckland | Physical | 23 Jan 2008 - 01 Sep 2015 |
9 Burford Place, Howick | Registered | 23 Jan 2008 - 01 Sep 2015 |
50 Amberwood Drive, Howick, Auckland | Physical & registered | 10 Aug 2006 - 23 Jan 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lockhart, Charlotte Anne Individual |
Oneroa Waiheke Island 1081 |
10 Aug 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lockhart, John Peter William Individual |
New Lynn Auckland 0600 |
01 Mar 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lockhart, Simon Richard Individual |
Howick Auckland |
10 Aug 2006 - 10 Aug 2006 |
Ariki Classic Yacht Limited 218 Delamore Drive |
|
Island Scaffolding Limited 17 Delamore Drive |
|
Marshall & Marshall Limited 161 Nick Johnstone Drive |
|
Church Bay Estate Limited 91 Nick Johnstone Drive |
|
Brealey Property Trustees Limited 60 Korora Road |
|
108 Mt Eden Road Limited 60 Korora Road |
Docreation Limited 7 Rata Street |
Staples Productions Limited 24a Bay Road |
Film Duende Limited 10 Maheke Street |
Alex Lewis Productions Limited Suite 2, 29a Picton Street |
Omnicron Productions Limited 10 Kaimata Street |
Rocketscience Design Limited 167 Long Drive |