Gito Limited (NZBN 9429033879826) was started on 18 Sep 2006. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 20 Roys Street, Marshland, Christchurch, 8083 (type: registered, physical). Flat 2, 196 Rutland Street, St Albans, Christchurch had been their registered address, up until 25 Feb 2019. 1000 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Costley, Duncan (an individual) located at Marshland, Christchurch postcode 8083. "House painting" (ANZSIC E324410) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Gito Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
20 Roys Street, Marshland, Christchurch, 8083 | Service & physical | 18 Feb 2019 |
20 Roys Street, Marshland, Christchurch, 8083 | Registered | 25 Feb 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Duncan Mark Costley
Marshland, Christchurch, 8083
Address used since 10 Feb 2019
St Albans, Christchurch, 8052
Address used since 16 Mar 2016 |
Director | 18 Sep 2006 - current |
Peter George Butcher
St Albans, Christchurch,
Address used since 18 Sep 2006 |
Director | 18 Sep 2006 - 31 Dec 2014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Flat 2, 196 Rutland Street, St Albans, Christchurch, 8052 | Registered | 24 May 2016 - 25 Feb 2019 |
Flat 2, 196 Rutland Street, St Albans, Christchurch, 8052 | Physical | 24 May 2016 - 18 Feb 2019 |
Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Ave, Addington, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered & physical | 05 Feb 2014 - 24 May 2016 |
C/-duns Limited, 28b Moorhouse Ave, Addington, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered & physical | 07 Apr 2011 - 05 Feb 2014 |
C/-duns Limited, Level 16, 119 Armagh Street, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 03 Jun 2008 - 07 Apr 2011 |
2/196 Rutland Street, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 18 Sep 2006 - 03 Jun 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Costley, Duncan Individual |
Marshland Christchurch 8083 |
18 Sep 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Butcher, Peter George Individual |
St Albans Christchurch |
18 Sep 2006 - 13 Apr 2015 |
Galbraiths Building Limited 26 Kenwyn Avenue |
|
Simplebiz Limited 28 Kenwyn Ave |
|
Grounded Collaboration Limited 28 Kenwyn Avenue |
|
Bjl Food Limited 28 Kenwyn Avenue |
|
Trainer Solutions Limited 22 Kenwyn Avenue |
|
Triple 6 Limited 175 Rutland Street |
Dvm Contracting And Painting Limited 14 Mathias Street |
Goldflash Decorators Limited 268 Cranford Street |
Greytone Painters & Decorators Limited 268 Cranford Street |
The Painters Limited 268 Cranford Street |
Dial-a-painta Limited 28a Hoani Street |
Metro Decorating Limited 115 Sherborne Street |