Honey Thread Limited (issued a business number of 9429033766379) was launched on 16 Nov 2006. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Floor 3, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: physical, service). Level 3, 18 Stanley Street, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 15 Jun 2020. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
New Zealand Custodians No.7 Limited (an entity) located at Auckland Central, Auckland postcode 1010. Our database was last updated on 16 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Floor 3, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & service & registered | 15 Jun 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Geoffrey Peter Cone
Br Balneario Santa Monica, Loc La Barra, Maldonado,
Address used since 31 Mar 2012 |
Director | 16 Nov 2006 - current |
Jesus Alberto Riera-herrera
De Miranda, Edificio Nina Dolores, Piso, 1, Carora, Estado Lara,
Address used since 04 May 2007 |
Director | 04 May 2007 - current |
Ramon Jose Riera-zubillaga
De Miranda, Edificio Nina Dolores, Piso, 1, Carora, Estado Lara,
Address used since 04 May 2007 |
Director | 04 May 2007 - current |
Oscar Eduardo Riera-herrera
De Miranda, Edificio Nina Dolores, Piso, 1, Carora, Estado Lara,
Address used since 04 May 2007 |
Director | 04 May 2007 - current |
Claire Judith Cooke
Pyes Pa, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 05 May 2022 |
Director | 05 May 2022 - current |
Karen Anne Marshall
Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 12 Dec 2019
Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 01 Oct 2013 |
Director | 01 Oct 2013 - 01 Apr 2022 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 18 Stanley Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 10 Nov 2014 - 15 Jun 2020 |
Level 3, 18 Stanley Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 28 Jul 2014 - 10 Nov 2014 |
Level 3, 280 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland | Registered & physical | 16 Nov 2006 - 28 Jul 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
New Zealand Custodians No.7 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033666587 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
19 Aug 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
New Zealand Escrow And Trust Co Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035546252 Company Number: 1481998 Entity |
16 Nov 2006 - 19 Aug 2015 | |
New Zealand Escrow And Trust Co Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035546252 Company Number: 1481998 Entity |
16 Nov 2006 - 19 Aug 2015 |
Bucklands Beach Investments Limited Level 6, 59 High Street |
|
Maui Finance Limited Level 10, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Rosenthal Trustee Company Limited Level 14, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Lzy Trustee Company Limited Level 1, 2 Princes Street |
|
New Zealand Academic And Learning Institute Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
|
Rennie Cox Trustees No.7 Limited Level 15, 126 Vincent Street |