Northgate Storm Water Management Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429033759500) was started on 24 Nov 2006. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 18 El Prado Drive, Milson, Palmerston North, 4414 (type: physical, service). 501 Main Street, Palmerston North, Palmerston North had been their physical address, up until 07 Apr 2022. 7 shares are allocated to 11 shareholders who belong to 7 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (14.29% of shares), namely:
Peters Way Industrial Park Limited (an entity) located at Silverdale, Auckland postcode 0932. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 14.29% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Baa Land Holdings Limited (an entity) - located at Silverdale, Auckland. The next group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 14.29%) belongs to 5 entities, namely:
Crossen, Karen Elizabeth, located at Browns Bay (an individual),
Wyndham Trustees Limited, located at Auckland Central, Auckland (an entity),
Herd, Kim Sandra, located at Forrest Hill, Auckland (an individual). Our data was updated on 29 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
633 Main Street, Palmerston North | Registered | 27 Nov 2008 |
18 El Prado Drive, Milson, Palmerston North, 4414 | Physical & service | 07 Apr 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Grant Ian Higgins
Greenlane, Auckland, 1051
Address used since 18 Oct 2023 |
Director | 18 Oct 2023 - current |
Antony Shane Higgins
Hokowhitu, Palmerston North, 4410
Address used since 18 Oct 2023 |
Director | 18 Oct 2023 - current |
Bernard Francis Higgins
Hokowhitu, Palmerston North, 4410
Address used since 19 May 2019
Hokowhitu, Palmerston North, 4410
Address used since 10 Jul 2017
Palmerston North, 4410
Address used since 16 Feb 2016 |
Director | 20 Nov 2008 - 18 Oct 2023 |
Brent Lawrence Glover
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 20 Oct 2009 |
Director | 24 Nov 2006 - 14 Apr 2014 |
Michael Peter John Higgins
Palemrston North,
Address used since 24 Nov 2006 |
Director | 24 Nov 2006 - 20 Nov 2008 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
501 Main Street, Palmerston North, Palmerston North, 4410 | Physical | 19 Jul 2017 - 07 Apr 2022 |
633 Main Street, Palmerston North | Physical | 27 Nov 2008 - 19 Jul 2017 |
420 Church Street, Palmerston North | Physical & registered | 24 Nov 2006 - 27 Nov 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Peters Way Industrial Park Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030048614 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Silverdale Auckland 0932 |
27 Nov 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Baa Land Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041268278 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Silverdale Auckland 0932 |
29 Sep 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Crossen, Karen Elizabeth Individual |
Browns Bay |
04 Nov 2008 - current |
Wyndham Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037014643 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
08 Jun 2009 - current |
Herd, Kim Sandra Individual |
Forrest Hill Auckland |
08 Jun 2009 - current |
Herd, Peter Wayne Individual |
Forrest Hill Auckland |
08 Jun 2009 - current |
Crossen, Grant John Individual |
Browns Bay |
04 Nov 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Body Corporate Number 450252 Other (Other) |
Auckland 1010 |
18 Mar 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fletcher Concrete And Infrastructure Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037777548 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Penrose Auckland 1061 |
07 Jul 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Frances Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038776595 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Palmerston North Palmerston North 4414 |
20 Aug 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
405271, Body Corporate Number Individual |
Triton Drive, Albany Auckland 0632 |
03 May 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tsco Developments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033045610 Company Number: 2052370 Entity |
02 Mar 2010 - 18 Mar 2013 | |
Northgate Business Park Stage 2 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037779238 Company Number: 922080 Entity |
08 Jun 2009 - 29 Sep 2016 | |
Peregrine Developments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036473731 Company Number: 1214405 Entity |
20 Aug 2008 - 27 Nov 2013 | |
Peregrine Developments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036473731 Company Number: 1214405 Entity |
20 Aug 2008 - 27 Nov 2013 | |
Tsco Developments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033045610 Company Number: 2052370 Entity |
02 Mar 2010 - 18 Mar 2013 | |
Pk Developments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033199085 Company Number: 1973841 Entity |
20 Oct 2008 - 08 May 2009 | |
Northgate Business Park Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040209807 Company Number: 165547 Entity |
24 Nov 2006 - 02 Mar 2010 | |
Silverstone Industrial Limited (in Liq) Shareholder NZBN: 9429033313207 Company Number: 1955699 Entity |
02 Mar 2010 - 03 May 2011 | |
Northgate Business Park Stage 2 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037779238 Company Number: 922080 Entity |
08 Jun 2009 - 29 Sep 2016 | |
Northgate Business Park Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040209807 Company Number: 165547 Entity |
24 Nov 2006 - 02 Mar 2010 | |
Pk Developments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033199085 Company Number: 1973841 Entity |
20 Oct 2008 - 08 May 2009 | |
Silverstone Industrial Limited (in Liq) Shareholder NZBN: 9429033313207 Company Number: 1955699 Entity |
02 Mar 2010 - 03 May 2011 |
Mayobridge Limited 501 Main Street |
|
Kellys Footwear Limited 507 Main Street |
|
Bennett Currie (2014) Limited 502 Main Street |
|
Add Trustees Limited 502 Main Street |
|
Cjd Trustees Limited 502 Main Street |
|
Rdbms Consulting Limited 502 Main Street |