Indigo Tunstall Trust Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429033686363) was launched on 15 Dec 2006. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 5, 47 Hereford Street, Christchurch, 8013 (type: registered, physical). Wynn Williams, Unit B, 195 Marshland Road, Shirley, Christchurch had been their physical address, until 21 Nov 2014. 1 share is allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1 share (100% of shares), namely:
Sheppard, Annabel Kate (an individual) located at Fendalton, Christchurch postcode 8052. Our database was last updated on 27 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 5, 47 Hereford Street, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered & physical & service | 21 Nov 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Annabel Kate Sheppard
Fendalton, Christchurch, 8052
Address used since 12 Mar 2019 |
Director | 12 Mar 2019 - current |
Oliver Roderick Matson
Saint Albans, Christchurch, 8052
Address used since 25 Feb 2010 |
Director | 15 Dec 2006 - 12 Mar 2019 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Wynn Williams, Unit B, 195 Marshland Road, Shirley, Christchurch, 8083 | Physical & registered | 19 Mar 2012 - 21 Nov 2014 |
Wynn Williams & Co, Level 7 Bnz House, 129 Hereford Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 15 Dec 2006 - 19 Mar 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sheppard, Annabel Kate Individual |
Fendalton Christchurch 8052 |
12 Mar 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Matson, Oliver Roderick Individual |
Christchurch |
15 Dec 2006 - 12 Mar 2019 |
Shield Trustees 2012 Limited Level 5 |
|
Anahera Trustees Limited Level 5 |
|
Aranz Medical Limited 1st Floor, 47 Hereford Street |
|
Earl Shareholding Trustees Limited Level 5 |
|
Turner And Crossen Trustees Limited Level 5 |
|
Matt Mandy Trustees Limited Level 5 |