Jb Hi-Fi Nz Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429033649177) was launched on 22 Jan 2007. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Level 1, 7 Link Drive, Wairau Park, Auckland, 0627 (type: office, delivery). Level 1, 7 Link Drive, Wairau Valley, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 30 Nov 2015. 60000100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 60000100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Jb Hi-Fi (A) Pty Limited (an other) located at Southbank, Victoria postcode 3006. Our database was updated on 24 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 7 Link Drive, Wairau Park, Auckland, 0627 | Physical & service & registered | 30 Nov 2015 |
Level 1, 7 Link Drive, Wairau Park, Auckland, 0627 | Office & delivery & postal | 20 Nov 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Nicholas John Wells
Southbank, Victoria, 3006
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Chadstone S/c, 1341 Dandenong Road, Chadstone, Victoria, 3148
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Chadstone S/c, 1341 Dandenong Road, Chadstone, Victoria, 3148
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Clifton Hill, Victoria, 3068
Address used since 19 Feb 2018
Hawthorn East, Victoria, 3123
Address used since 27 Jun 2016 |
Director | 23 Jul 2014 - current |
Terry David Smart
Southbank, Victoria, 3006
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Brighton, Victoria, 3186
Address used since 27 Aug 2021 |
Director | 27 Aug 2021 - current |
Richard Lindsay Murray
Hawthorn, Victoria, 3122
Address used since 28 Jan 2021
Southbank, Victoria, 3006
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Chadstone S/c, 1341 Dandenong Road, Chadstone, Victoria, 3148
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Camberwell, Victoria, 3124
Address used since 12 Mar 2011
Chadstone S/c, 1341 Dandenong Road, Chadstone, Victoria, 3148
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Toorak, Victoria, 3142
Address used since 28 Jun 2017 |
Director | 22 Jan 2007 - 27 Aug 2021 |
Terry David Smart
Brighton, Vic, 3186
Address used since 03 Oct 2011 |
Director | 03 Oct 2011 - 30 Jun 2014 |
Robert Bruce Collins
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 25 Sep 2007 |
Director | 25 Sep 2007 - 07 Oct 2011 |
Nigel Melcolm Merrett
Meadowbank, Auckland,
Address used since 25 Sep 2007 |
Director | 25 Sep 2007 - 01 Apr 2008 |
Terry Smart
Elwood 3184, Victoria, Australia,
Address used since 22 Jan 2007 |
Director | 22 Jan 2007 - 25 Sep 2007 |
Richard Anders Uechtritz
Rose Bay 2029, Nsw, Australia,
Address used since 22 Jan 2007 |
Director | 22 Jan 2007 - 25 Sep 2007 |
Level 1, 7 Link Drive , Wairau Park , Auckland , 0627 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 7 Link Drive, Wairau Valley, Auckland, 0627 | Physical & registered | 17 Apr 2015 - 30 Nov 2015 |
12/1 Wagener Place, St Lukes, Auckland | Registered & physical | 02 Oct 2007 - 17 Apr 2015 |
Level 7, 28 Brandon Street, Wellington | Physical & registered | 22 Jan 2007 - 02 Oct 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jb Hi-fi (a) Pty Limited Other (Other) |
Southbank Victoria 3006 |
22 Jan 2007 - current |
Effective Date | 28 Apr 2019 |
Name | Jb Hi-fi Limited |
Type | Public Company |
Country of origin | AU |
Address |
60 City Road Southbank Victoria 3006 |
Integrity Trustees Limited Unit 20, Level 1, 18 Link Drive |
|
Elcom Global Limited Level 1, 20 Link Drive |
|
Jb Hi-fi Group (nz) Limited Level 1, 7 Link Drive |
|
Integrity Trustees (2008) Limited Unit 20, Level 1, 18 Link Drive |
|
Lifeart Limited 110 Wairau Road |
|
Dying Art Limited 110 Wairau Road |