Gibberslea Farm Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429033627267) was registered on 02 Mar 2007. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 1 Coquet Street, Oamaru, 9400 (type: registered, physical). 1 Coquet Street, Oamaru had been their registered address, until 17 Jul 2019. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 90 shares (90% of shares), namely:
Mcculloch, Bruce William (an individual) located at Waimate postcode 7980. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 10% of all shares (exactly 10 shares); it includes
Mcculloch, Bruce William (an individual) - located at Waimate. Businesscheck's database was updated on 05 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
1 Coquet Street, Oamaru, 9400 | Registered & physical & service | 17 Jul 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Bruce William Mcculloch
Waimate, Waimate, 7980
Address used since 14 Jul 2015 |
Director | 02 Mar 2007 - current |
Kathleen Ann Mcculloch
Waimate, Waimate, 7980
Address used since 14 Jul 2015 |
Director | 02 Mar 2007 - 26 Oct 2020 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1 Coquet Street, Oamaru, 9400 | Registered & physical | 15 Jul 2014 - 17 Jul 2019 |
Whk, 1 Coquet Street, Oamaru, 9400 | Registered & physical | 09 Aug 2011 - 15 Jul 2014 |
Wanbrow House, 6 Coquet Street, Oamaru | Registered & physical | 02 Mar 2007 - 09 Aug 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcculloch, Bruce William Individual |
Waimate 7980 |
02 Mar 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcculloch, Bruce William Individual |
Waimate 7980 |
02 Mar 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcculloch, Kathleen Ann Individual |
Waimate 7980 |
02 Mar 2007 - 12 Aug 2021 |
Mcculloch, Kathleen Ann Individual |
Waimate 7980 |
02 Mar 2007 - 12 Aug 2021 |
Wanbrow Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040805337 Company Number: 35393 Entity |
02 Mar 2007 - 27 Aug 2014 | |
Wanbrow Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040805337 Company Number: 35393 Entity |
02 Mar 2007 - 27 Aug 2014 |
Taupo Farming Limited 1 Coquet Street |
|
Seamist Dairies Limited 1 Coquet Street |
|
Tamac Farms Limited 1 Coquet Street |
|
Hireplus Oamaru Limited 1 Coquet Street |
|
Plunket Electrical (2005) Limited 1 Coquet Street |
|
D.c. And D.a. Macdonald Limited 1 Coquet Street |