Blue Mercury Limited (NZBN 9429033393896) was incorporated on 15 May 2007. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 18 Olivers Place, Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300 (type: registered, physical). Flat 69 Greenstone Terraces, 716 Frankton Road, Queenstown, Queenstown had been their registered address, until 18 Feb 2022. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Woodings, David (an individual) located at Winchester postcode 7985. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Woodings, Kayleigh (an individual) - located at Queenstown, Queenstown. Our information was updated on 10 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
18 Olivers Place, Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300 | Registered & physical & service | 18 Feb 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kayleigh Jane Woodings
Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300
Address used since 04 Feb 2022
Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300
Address used since 23 Jun 2020 |
Director | 23 Jun 2020 - current |
Iain Edward Phillips
Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300
Address used since 15 Feb 2024 |
Director | 15 Feb 2024 - current |
David John Woodings
Winchester, 7985
Address used since 01 Sep 2021
Woolston, Christchurch, 8023
Address used since 29 Mar 2010 |
Director | 15 May 2007 - 19 Feb 2024 |
Sharon Lee Woodings
Woolston, Christchurch, 8023
Address used since 29 Mar 2010 |
Director | 15 May 2007 - 13 Jun 2020 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Flat 69 Greenstone Terraces, 716 Frankton Road, Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300 | Registered & physical | 16 Mar 2021 - 18 Feb 2022 |
Level 1, 270 St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 | Physical & registered | 15 Apr 2019 - 16 Mar 2021 |
Level 1, 22 Foster Street, Tower Junction, Christchurch, 8011 | Physical & registered | 14 Dec 2018 - 15 Apr 2019 |
Level 4, 123 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered & physical | 30 Mar 2017 - 14 Dec 2018 |
Level 1, 567 Wairakei Road, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Physical & registered | 15 Mar 2012 - 30 Mar 2017 |
Lexicon House, 123 Spey Street, Invercargill | Physical & registered | 03 Oct 2007 - 15 Mar 2012 |
32 Don Street, Invercargill | Registered & physical | 15 May 2007 - 03 Oct 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Woodings, David Individual |
Winchester 7985 |
15 May 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Woodings, Kayleigh Individual |
Queenstown Queenstown 9300 |
15 Jun 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Woodings, Sharon Individual |
Opawa Christchurch |
15 May 2007 - 15 Jun 2020 |
Leighs Cockram Jv Limited Level 2, 219 High Street |
|
Reardon Holdings Limited Level 2, 205 Durham Street South |
|
Dravitzki Trustees Limited Level 2, 14 Dundas Street |
|
Delwyn Denton-lanauze Trustee Limited Level 2, 14 Dundas Street |
|
Manning Trustees Limited Level 2, 14 Dundas Street |
|
Ah Trust Co Limited Level 2, 14 Dundas Street |