Tourmalet Property Management Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429033344263) was started on 12 Jun 2007. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 16 Kiwi Street, Alicetown, Lower Hutt, 5010 (type: physical, service). 72 Naples Street, Martinborough, Martinborough had been their registered address, until 29 May 2015. Tourmalet Property Management Limited used other aliases, namely: Peleton Communications Limited from 12 Jun 2007 to 30 Sep 2021. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Elder, Nigel (an individual) located at Alicetown, Lower Hutt postcode 5010. Businesscheck's data was updated on 30 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
16 Kiwi Street, Alicetown, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Registered | 29 May 2015 |
16 Kiwi Street, Alicetown, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Physical & service | 20 Aug 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Nigel Paul Elder
Alicetown, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 18 May 2018 |
Director | 12 Jun 2007 - current |
Nigel Elder
Alicetown, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 18 May 2018
Martinborough, Martinborough, 5711
Address used since 19 Apr 2014 |
Director | 12 Jun 2007 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
72 Naples Street, Martinborough, Martinborough, 5711 | Registered | 30 Apr 2014 - 29 May 2015 |
Flat 36, 43 Mulgrave Street, Thorndon, Wellington, 6011 | Physical | 20 Apr 2011 - 20 Aug 2020 |
Flat 36, 43 Mulgrave Street, Thorndon, Wellington, 6011 | Registered | 20 Apr 2011 - 30 Apr 2014 |
C/-45 Grey Street, Martinborough | Registered & physical | 12 Jun 2007 - 20 Apr 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Elder, Nigel Individual |
Alicetown Lower Hutt 5010 |
12 Jun 2007 - current |
Bowron Investments Limited 1/43 Mulgrave Street |
|
Bisaty Limited 55 Mulgrave Street |
|
Mighty Rocket Consulting Limited 54/37 Mulgrave Street |
|
Taxation Recovery Services Limited 54/37 Mulgrave Street |
|
Cook Islands Property Corporation (nz) Limited 56 Mulgrave Street |
|
Huia (nz) Limited 39 Pipitea Street |