Exotic Tours Limited (issued a business number of 9429033321820) was started on 20 Jun 2007. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 207A Forrest Hill Road, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 (type: physical, service). 1-211 Forrest Hill Road, Forrest Hill, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 16 Apr 2019. Exotic Tours Limited used more aliases, namely: Exotic Tours Limited from 10 Dec 2009 to 21 Jan 2016, Exotic Holidays Limited (20 Jun 2007 to 10 Dec 2009). 1 share is allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Sharma, Rahul (an individual) located at Forrest Hill, Auckland postcode 0620. "Booking service (passenger transport and/or accommodation)" (ANZSIC N722010) is the category the ABS issued Exotic Tours Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 20 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
207a Forrest Hill Road, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 | Registered | 17 Feb 2012 |
207a Forrest Hill Road, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 | Physical & service | 16 Apr 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Rahul Sharma
Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 01 Mar 2015 |
Director | 03 Dec 2009 - current |
Vipul Bhatnagar
Dannemora, Auckland, New Zealand,
Address used since 22 Dec 2008 |
Director | 22 Dec 2008 - 08 Feb 2010 |
Vandana Sharma
Glenfield, Auckland,
Address used since 20 Jun 2007 |
Director | 20 Jun 2007 - 23 Dec 2008 |
207a Forrest Hill Road , Forrest Hill , Auckland , 0620 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1-211 Forrest Hill Road, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 | Physical | 12 Apr 2017 - 16 Apr 2019 |
207a Forrest Hill Road, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 | Physical | 17 Feb 2012 - 12 Apr 2017 |
1-20 Athena Drive, Sunnynook, North Shore, Auckland | Physical & registered | 10 Dec 2009 - 17 Feb 2012 |
73, Smales Road, Dannemora, Auckland | Registered & physical | 08 Jan 2009 - 10 Dec 2009 |
1/20 Athena Dr, Glenfield, Auckland, New Zealand | Registered & physical | 20 Jun 2007 - 08 Jan 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sharma, Rahul Individual |
Forrest Hill Auckland 0620 |
08 Feb 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sharma, Vandana Individual |
Glenfield Auckland |
20 Jun 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Bhatnagar, Vipul Individual |
Dannemora Auckland, New Zealand |
23 Dec 2008 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Exotic Holidays Limited 207a Forrest Hill Road |
|
Lintek Global Limited 17 Knightsbridge Drive |
|
Sunflower Field NZ Limited 19a Knightsbridge Drive |
|
Esteem Consulting Limited 13 Knightsbridge Drive |
|
Serene Properties Limited 193 Forrest Hill Road |
|
Ravla Holdings Limited 193 Forrest Hill Road |
Puddle Limited 28 Baltimore Place |
Yatra New Zealand Limited 19a Kapiti Place |
Nanguo Ticket And Tour Limited Suite 2, 33 View Road |
Enterprising Indonz Limited 42 Karaka Street |
Tropical Island Yoga Limited 96 Hurstmere Road |
NZ Anran Coach Limited 18 Shortland Street |