Harvicsta Dairy Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429033121543) was started on 20 Sep 2007. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 15A Hokonui Drive, Gore (type: physical, service). 1200 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 1180 shares (98.33% of shares), namely:
Peeters, Hendrikus Fransiscus (an individual) located at Rd 6, Gore postcode 9776,
Peeters, Colette Elizabeth (an individual) located at Rd 6, Gore postcode 9776. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.83% of all shares (10 shares); it includes
Peeters, Hendrikus Fransiscus (an individual) - located at Rd 6, Riversdale. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allotment (10 shares, 0.83%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Peeters, Colette Elizabeth, located at Rd 6, Riversdale (an individual). Our database was last updated on 17 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
15a Hokonui Drive, Gore | Physical & service & registered | 20 Sep 2007 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Hendrikus Fransiscus Peeters
Rd 6, Gore, 9776
Address used since 06 Dec 2022
Rd 6, Riversdale, 9776
Address used since 01 Mar 2018
Rd 6, Gore, 9776
Address used since 23 Aug 2014 |
Director | 20 Sep 2007 - current |
Colette Elizabeth Peeters
Rd 6, Gore, 9776
Address used since 06 Dec 2022
Rd 6, Gore, 9776
Address used since 23 Aug 2014
Rd 6, Riversdale, 9776
Address used since 01 Mar 2017 |
Director | 17 Apr 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Peeters, Hendrikus Fransiscus Individual |
Rd 6 Gore 9776 |
20 Sep 2007 - current |
Peeters, Colette Elizabeth Individual |
Rd 6 Gore 9776 |
20 Sep 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Peeters, Hendrikus Fransiscus Individual |
Rd 6 Riversdale 9776 |
20 Sep 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Peeters, Colette Elizabeth Individual |
Rd 6 Riversdale 9776 |
20 Sep 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rural Growth Fund Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033438368 Company Number: 1935975 Entity |
25 Aug 2008 - 16 Oct 2012 | |
Rural Growth Fund Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033438368 Company Number: 1935975 Entity |
25 Aug 2008 - 16 Oct 2012 |
Blue Mountain Nurseries Limited 15a Hokonui Drive |
|
Mcclintock Contracting Limited 15a Hokonui Drive |
|
C & T Scoles Limited 15a Hokonui Drive |
|
Avonmac Limited 15a Hokonui Drive |
|
Matthew Gardyne Engineering Limited 15a Hokonui Drive |
|
Scott Innovation Limited 15a Hokonui Drive |