Rhyscott Holdings Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429033077734) was incorporated on 31 Oct 2007. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 3A / 335 Lincoln Road, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 (type: registered, physical). 335 Lincoln Road, Addington, Christchurch had been their physical address, until 17 Jan 2020. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 99 shares (99% of shares), namely:
Barrington, Clive John (an individual) located at Halswell, Christchurch postcode 8025. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Barrington, Gillian Lorraine (an individual) - located at Halswell, Christchurch. Our information was last updated on 03 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
3a / 335 Lincoln Road, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 | Registered & physical & service | 17 Jan 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Clive John Barrington
Halswell, Christchurch, 8025
Address used since 29 Jul 2022
Rd 6, Christchurch, 7676
Address used since 27 Aug 2009 |
Director | 31 Oct 2007 - current |
Gillian Lorraine Barrington
Halswell, Christchurch, 8025
Address used since 29 Jul 2022
Rd 6, Christchurch, 7676
Address used since 27 Aug 2009 |
Director | 31 Oct 2007 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
335 Lincoln Road, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 | Physical & registered | 25 Sep 2013 - 17 Jan 2020 |
116 Marshland Road, Shirley, Christchurch, 8061 | Registered | 13 Jul 2011 - 25 Sep 2013 |
Markhams Christchurch Limited, 116 Marshland Road, Christchurch, 8061 | Physical | 13 Jul 2011 - 25 Sep 2013 |
Markhams Christchurch Limited, Level Five, 144 Kilmore Street, Christchurch, 8013 | Physical & registered | 04 Oct 2010 - 13 Jul 2011 |
Markhams Christchurch Limited, Level Five, 144 Kilmore Street, Christchurch | Registered | 08 Sep 2008 - 04 Oct 2010 |
Markhams Christchurch Ltd, Level Five, 144 Kilmore Street, Christchurch | Physical | 08 Sep 2008 - 04 Oct 2010 |
Markhams Mri Christchurch Ltd, Level Five, 144 Kilmore Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 31 Oct 2007 - 08 Sep 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Barrington, Clive John Individual |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 |
31 Oct 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Barrington, Gillian Lorraine Individual |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 |
31 Oct 2007 - current |
Wigram Close Investments Limited 335 Lincoln Road |
|
Sacred Water Limited 335 Lincoln Road |
|
Blondell Holdings Limited 335 Lincoln Road |
|
Levide Capital Limited 335 Lincoln Road |
|
Build Master Homes Limited 335 Lincoln Road |
|
Capital Investment Planning Limited 335 Lincoln Road |