Emservico Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429033077352) was launched on 19 Oct 2007. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1, 2 Commerce Street, Whakatane, 3120 (type: registered, physical). Level 1, 2 Commerce Street, Whakatane had been their physical address, up to 24 Jul 2019. 100 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 3 entities and holds 98 shares (98% of shares), namely:
Wilson, Diane Moragh (an individual) located at Rd 3, Whakatane postcode 3193,
Farmit Trustees (Coldi) Limited (an entity) located at 2 Commerce Street, Whakatane postcode 3120,
Wilson, Colin Ross (an individual) located at Rd 3, Whakatane postcode 3193. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Wilson, Colin Ross (an individual) - located at Rd 3, Whakatane. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Wilson, Diane Moragh, located at Rd 3, Whakatane (an individual). The Businesscheck data was updated on 17 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 2 Commerce Street, Whakatane, 3120 | Registered & physical & service | 24 Jul 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Colin Ross Wilson
Rd 3, Whakatane, 3193
Address used since 27 Mar 2014 |
Director | 19 Oct 2007 - current |
Diane Moragh Wilson
Rd 3, Whakatane, 3193
Address used since 27 Mar 2014 |
Director | 19 Oct 2007 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 2 Commerce Street, Whakatane, 3120 | Physical & registered | 27 Apr 2016 - 24 Jul 2019 |
165 The Strand, Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 | Registered & physical | 15 Apr 2016 - 27 Apr 2016 |
106 Commercestreet, Whakatane, 3120 | Registered & physical | 18 Feb 2016 - 15 Apr 2016 |
106 Commercestreet, Whakatane | Registered & physical | 13 Aug 2009 - 18 Feb 2016 |
Quay Accountants Limited, 156 The Strand, Whakatane | Registered & physical | 19 Oct 2007 - 13 Aug 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wilson, Diane Moragh Individual |
Rd 3 Whakatane 3193 |
19 Oct 2007 - current |
Farmit Trustees (coldi) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042468325 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
2 Commerce Street Whakatane 3120 |
24 Aug 2016 - current |
Wilson, Colin Ross Individual |
Rd 3 Whakatane 3193 |
19 Oct 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wilson, Colin Ross Individual |
Rd 3 Whakatane 3193 |
19 Oct 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wilson, Diane Moragh Individual |
Rd 3 Whakatane 3193 |
19 Oct 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gray, Maxwell Thomas Kimball Individual |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 |
19 Oct 2007 - 24 Aug 2016 |
Quay Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037519582 Company Number: 972170 Entity |
19 Oct 2007 - 24 Aug 2016 | |
Quay Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037519582 Company Number: 972170 Entity |
19 Oct 2007 - 24 Aug 2016 |
Whakatane District Council Employees Association Incorporated C/o Whakatane District Council |
|
The Eastern Bay Of Plenty Mayoral Disaster Relief Fund Trust 14 Commerce Street |
|
Tumanako Hou Trust Whakatane 4 Canning Place |
|
Matahina F Trust Forests Limited 189 The Strand |
|
National General Services Limited Suite 2, 189 The Strand |
|
Bay Steel Contractors Limited Suite 1, 189 The Strand |