Tjm Contracting Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429033072234) was incorporated on 25 Oct 2007. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 162 Wicksteed Street, Whanganui, 4500 (type: registered, physical). 35 Drews Avenue, Whanganui had been their physical address, until 14 Sep 2020. 100 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 80 shares (80 per cent of shares), namely:
Martin, Julia Elizabeth (an individual) located at Palmerston North,
Martin, Tony John (an individual) located at Palmerston North. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 10 per cent of all shares (10 shares); it includes
Martin, Julia Elizabeth (an individual) - located at Palmerston North. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allotment (10 shares, 10%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Martin, Tony John, located at Palmerston North (an individual). Businesscheck's information was last updated on 04 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
162 Wicksteed Street, Whanganui, 4500 | Registered & physical & service | 14 Sep 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Julia Elizabeth Martin
Palmerston North, 4474
Address used since 23 Oct 2015 |
Director | 25 Oct 2007 - current |
Tony John Martin
Palmerston North, 4474
Address used since 23 Oct 2015 |
Director | 25 Oct 2007 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
35 Drews Avenue, Whanganui, 4500 | Physical & registered | 27 Sep 2018 - 14 Sep 2020 |
Gregor Vallely, 35 Drews Avenue, Wanganui | Physical & registered | 25 Oct 2007 - 27 Sep 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Martin, Julia Elizabeth Individual |
Palmerston North |
25 Oct 2007 - current |
Martin, Tony John Individual |
Palmerston North |
25 Oct 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Martin, Julia Elizabeth Individual |
Palmerston North |
25 Oct 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Martin, Tony John Individual |
Palmerston North |
25 Oct 2007 - current |
Wanganui Boys & Girls Gym Club Incorporated C/o Gregor Valley |
|
Whanganui Musicians Club Incorporated 25 Drews Avenue |
|
Etcetera Bridal Limited 1a Rutland Street |
|
Frail Limited 1a Rutland Street |
|
B.a.s.i.c.s. Incorporated 42 Drews Avenue |
|
Cohens Business Centre Limited 35 Ridgway Street |