Ascent Business Consulting Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429033052229) was incorporated on 19 Nov 2007. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 4, 86 Victoria Street, Wellington, 6011 (type: registered, physical). Level 7, 44 Victoria Street, Wellington had been their physical address, up until 14 Aug 2017. 1200 shares are allotted to 7 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 400 shares (33.33 per cent of shares), namely:
Mabin, Dougald Speedy (an individual) located at Rd 1, Waipukurau postcode 4281,
Collier, Matthew (an individual) located at Wilton, Wellington postcode 6035. When considering the second group, a total of 3 shareholders hold 33.33 per cent of all shares (400 shares); it includes
Soderberg, Deryk John (an individual) - located at Auckland,
Pocock, Bryan George (an individual) - located at Martinborough,
Soderberg, Karen Jane (an individual) - located at Paraparaumu. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (400 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Pocock, Bryan George, located at Martinborough (an individual),
Nicholls, Christopher Rex, located at Karori, Wellington (an individual). Our database was last updated on 31 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 4, 86 Victoria Street, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical & service | 14 Aug 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Matthew Collier
Wilton, Wellington, 6035
Address used since 27 Nov 2017
Khandallah, Wellington, 6035
Address used since 19 Nov 2007 |
Director | 19 Nov 2007 - current |
Deryk John Soderberg
Auckland, 1023
Address used since 22 Nov 2023
Kelburn, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 07 Dec 2012 |
Director | 19 Nov 2007 - current |
Christopher Rex Nicholls
Karori, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 27 Nov 2017
Karori, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 21 Nov 2016 |
Director | 19 Nov 2007 - current |
Laurence Dorian Sibley
Blockhouse Bay, Auckland, 0600
Address used since 19 Nov 2007 |
Director | 19 Nov 2007 - 26 Jun 2015 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 7, 44 Victoria Street, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 27 Sep 2010 - 14 Aug 2017 |
Level 11 Sovereign House, 34-42 Manners Street, Wellington 6011 | Registered & physical | 25 Mar 2010 - 27 Sep 2010 |
C/-markhams Mri Wellington, 354 Lambton Quay, Wellington | Physical & registered | 19 Nov 2007 - 25 Mar 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mabin, Dougald Speedy Individual |
Rd 1 Waipukurau 4281 |
01 Jun 2018 - current |
Collier, Matthew Individual |
Wilton Wellington 6035 |
19 Nov 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Soderberg, Deryk John Individual |
Auckland 1023 |
19 Nov 2007 - current |
Pocock, Bryan George Individual |
Martinborough 5711 |
20 Dec 2011 - current |
Soderberg, Karen Jane Individual |
Paraparaumu 5032 |
19 Nov 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pocock, Bryan George Individual |
Martinborough 5711 |
20 Dec 2011 - current |
Nicholls, Christopher Rex Individual |
Karori Wellington 6012 |
19 Nov 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Withers Tsang & Co Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037396343 Company Number: 1009160 Entity |
19 Nov 2007 - 20 Dec 2011 | |
Advisory Trustees 08 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032960730 Company Number: 2080471 Entity |
23 Apr 2008 - 19 Nov 2013 | |
Sibley, Laurence Dorian Individual |
Blockhouse Bay Auckland |
23 Apr 2008 - 26 Jun 2015 |
Advisory Trustees No. 2 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035124115 Company Number: 1568044 Entity |
19 Nov 2007 - 01 Jun 2012 | |
Withers Tsang & Co Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037396343 Company Number: 1009160 Entity |
19 Nov 2007 - 20 Dec 2011 | |
Jones, Peter Individual |
Khandallah Wellington |
19 Nov 2007 - 01 Jun 2018 |
Van Mil, Helen Christina Individual |
Wadestown Wellington |
19 Nov 2007 - 19 Dec 2016 |
Advisory Trustees 08 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032960730 Company Number: 2080471 Entity |
23 Apr 2008 - 19 Nov 2013 | |
Advisory Trustees No. 2 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035124115 Company Number: 1568044 Entity |
19 Nov 2007 - 01 Jun 2012 | |
Sibley, Laurence Dorian Individual |
Blockhouse Bay Auckland |
19 Nov 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Collier, Vivienne Individual |
Khandallah Wellington |
19 Nov 2007 - 01 Jun 2018 |
Sibley, Jennifer Anne Individual |
Blockhouse Bay Auckland |
23 Apr 2008 - 26 Jun 2015 |
Pooja Foods Limited Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay |
|
M G Bale Trustees (hill 16) Limited Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street |
|
Sounds Lifestyle Investments Limited Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street |
|
Customs Agents Wellington Limited Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay |
|
Ppem Nominees Limited Level 14, 1-3 Willeston Street |
|
Glading Family Trustees Limited Level 10, Greenock House, 39 The Terrace |