Parihaka Trustees (2008) Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429032946635) was launched on 30 Jan 2008. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 9 Hunt Street, Whangarei, 0110 (type: physical, registered). C/-Webb Ross, 9 Hunt Street, Whangarei had been their physical address, up until 11 Nov 2014. 2050 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 2050 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Wrmk Trustee Holding Company Limited (an entity) located at Whangarei, Whangarei postcode 0110. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
C/-wrmk Lawyers, 9 Hunt Street, Whangarei, 0110 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 03 Nov 2014 |
9 Hunt Street, Whangarei, 0110 | Physical & registered & service | 11 Nov 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Patrick Joseph Basil Steuart
Greenlane, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 05 Nov 2020 |
Director | 05 Nov 2020 - current |
Rebecca Grace Merry
Maungakaramea, 0178
Address used since 05 Nov 2020 |
Director | 05 Nov 2020 - current |
Tania Leeann Moewaka Beckham
Rd 4, Parua Bay, 0174
Address used since 05 Nov 2020 |
Director | 05 Nov 2020 - current |
Wayne David Mckean
Whau Valley, Whangarei, 0112
Address used since 05 Nov 2020 |
Director | 05 Nov 2020 - current |
David Mark Grindle
Rd 4, Parua Bay, 0174
Address used since 05 Nov 2020 |
Director | 05 Nov 2020 - current |
Christopher Thomas Taylor
Rd 5, Whareora, 0175
Address used since 01 Mar 2024
Rd 3, Whangarei, 0173
Address used since 05 Nov 2020 |
Director | 05 Nov 2020 - current |
Jared Bryan Cains
Kamo, Whangarei, 0112
Address used since 23 Feb 2024 |
Director | 23 Feb 2024 - current |
Andrew John Easterbrook
Kamo, Whangarei, 0112
Address used since 23 Feb 2024 |
Director | 23 Feb 2024 - current |
Steve Anthony Wong
Whangarei, 0112
Address used since 26 Nov 2015 |
Director | 30 Jan 2008 - 23 Feb 2024 |
Megan Alyse Bawden
Rd 1, Kamo, 0185
Address used since 01 Apr 2011 |
Director | 01 Apr 2011 - 31 Mar 2023 |
Tony John Savage
Kensington, Whangarei, 0112
Address used since 18 Jan 2019
Regent, Whangarei, 0112
Address used since 06 Dec 2016 |
Director | 29 May 2015 - 16 Jun 2021 |
Neil Finlay Mcnab
Regent, Whangarei, 0112
Address used since 01 Oct 2012 |
Director | 01 Oct 2012 - 15 Oct 2020 |
James Kilpatrick
Rd 3, Whangarei, 0173
Address used since 01 Oct 2012 |
Director | 01 Oct 2012 - 31 Mar 2018 |
Wayne David Mckean
Whau Valley, Whangarei, 0112
Address used since 21 Oct 2009 |
Director | 30 Jan 2008 - 24 Mar 2014 |
Stuart Owen Spicer
Onerahi, Whangarei, 0110
Address used since 30 Jan 2008 |
Director | 30 Jan 2008 - 24 Mar 2014 |
David Mark Grindle
Parua Bay 0174,
Address used since 11 May 2010 |
Director | 11 May 2010 - 24 Mar 2014 |
Tony John Savage
Rd 3, Whangarei, 0173
Address used since 01 Oct 2012 |
Director | 01 Oct 2012 - 24 Mar 2014 |
Roger Murray Bell
Parahaki, Whangarei, 0112
Address used since 21 Oct 2009 |
Director | 30 Jan 2008 - 03 Dec 2009 |
Andrew James Golightly
Whangarei,
Address used since 30 Jan 2008 |
Director | 30 Jan 2008 - 16 Sep 2008 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/-webb Ross, 9 Hunt Street, Whangarei | Physical & registered | 30 Jan 2008 - 11 Nov 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wrmk Trustee Holding Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030118775 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Whangarei Whangarei 0110 |
05 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bawden, Megan Alyse Individual |
Rd 1 Kamo 0185 |
02 Mar 2012 - 05 Nov 2020 |
Mckean, Wayne David Individual |
Whangarei |
30 Jan 2008 - 05 Nov 2020 |
Wong, Steve Anthony Individual |
Whangarei |
30 Jan 2008 - 05 Nov 2020 |
Grindle, David Mark Individual |
Parua Bay 0174 |
19 May 2010 - 05 Nov 2020 |
Bell, Roger Murray Individual |
Whangarei |
30 Jan 2008 - 16 Sep 2008 |
Golightly, Andrew James Individual |
Whangarei |
30 Jan 2008 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Spicer, Stuart Owen Individual |
Onerahi Whangarei |
30 Jan 2008 - 21 Nov 2014 |
Wrmk Trustee Holding Company Limited 9 Hunt Street |
|
Wrmk Messina Trustee Company Limited 9 Hunt Street |
|
Michael Springford Trustee Limited 9 Hunt Street |
|
Jr & Ca Smith Family Trustee Limited 9 Hunt Street |
|
Wrmk Trustees (2013) Limited 9 Hunt Street |
|
Griffiths & Associates Trustee Limited 9 Hunt Street |