Raphael Holdings Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429032838725) was started on 28 Mar 2008. 6 addresess are in use by the company: Greenlea Premier Meats, 247 Kahikatea Drive, Hamilton (type: other, shareregister). Deloitte, 24 Bridge Street, Hamilton East, Hamilton 3216 had been their physical address, up to 29 Oct 2009. 10000000 shares are allotted to 14 shareholders who belong to 6 shareholder groups. The first group includes 3 entities and holds 1678678 shares (16.79 per cent of shares), namely:
Mccaw Lewis Chapman Trustees (No. 2) Limited (an entity) located at Hamilton Central, Hamilton postcode 3204,
Egan, Joan Lesley (an individual) located at Rd 9, Hamilton postcode 3289,
Egan, James Anthony (an individual) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 3 shareholders hold 16.72 per cent of all shares (1671816 shares); it includes
Mccaw Lewis Chapman Trustees (No. 2) Limited (an entity) - located at Hamilton Central, Hamilton,
Egan, James Anthony (an individual) - located at Remuera, Auckland,
Egan, Joan Lesley (an individual) - located at Rd 9, Hamilton. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allotment (1020773 shares, 10.21%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Egan, Simon Peter, located at Devonport, Auckland (a director),
Mccaw Lewis Trustees Limited, located at Hamilton Central, Hamilton (an other). "Holding company operation - passive investment in subsidiary companies" (ANZSIC K624030) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Raphael Holdings Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 28 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
247 Kahikatea Drive, Hamilton | Physical & registered & service | 29 Oct 2009 |
Greenlea Premier Meats Ltd, 247 Kahikatea Drive, Hamilton | Other (Address for Records) & records (Address for Records) | 29 Oct 2009 |
Greenlea Premier Meats, 247 Kahikatea Drive, Hamilton | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 30 Oct 2009 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
James Anthony Egan
Half Moon Bay, Auckland, 2012
Address used since 28 Mar 2008
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 30 Nov 2017 |
Director | 28 Mar 2008 - current |
Caroline Marie Egan
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 30 Nov 2017
Rd 2, Papakura, Auckland, 2582
Address used since 28 Mar 2008 |
Director | 28 Mar 2008 - current |
Simon Peter Egan
Devonport, Auckland, 0624
Address used since 03 Nov 2021
Beachlands, Auckland, 2018
Address used since 28 Mar 2008 |
Director | 28 Mar 2008 - current |
Philip George Harris
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 01 Nov 2023
Hillcrest, Hamilton, 3216
Address used since 22 Oct 2010 |
Director | 22 Oct 2010 - current |
Joan Lesley Egan
Rd 9, Hamilton, 3289
Address used since 28 Mar 2008 |
Director | 28 Mar 2008 - 03 Feb 2022 |
Peter James Egan
Rd 9, Hamilton, 3289
Address used since 28 Mar 2008 |
Director | 28 Mar 2008 - 10 Dec 2021 |
6 Glenbrook Street , Remuera , Auckland , 1050 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Deloitte, 24 Bridge Street, Hamilton East, Hamilton 3216 | Physical & registered | 25 May 2009 - 29 Oct 2009 |
Deloitte, Fonterra House, 80 London Street, Hamilton | Physical & registered | 28 Mar 2008 - 25 May 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mccaw Lewis Chapman Trustees (no. 2) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034907207 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Hamilton Central Hamilton 3204 |
28 Mar 2008 - current |
Egan, Joan Lesley Individual |
Rd 9 Hamilton 3289 |
28 Mar 2008 - current |
Egan, James Anthony Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
28 Mar 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mccaw Lewis Chapman Trustees (no. 2) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034907207 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Hamilton Central Hamilton 3204 |
28 Mar 2008 - current |
Egan, James Anthony Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
28 Mar 2008 - current |
Egan, Joan Lesley Individual |
Rd 9 Hamilton 3289 |
28 Mar 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Egan, Simon Peter Director |
Devonport Auckland 0624 |
03 Feb 2022 - current |
Mccaw Lewis Trustees Limited Other (Other) |
Hamilton Central Hamilton 3204 |
22 Sep 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mccaw Lewis Chapman Trustees (no. 2) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034907207 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Hamilton Central Hamilton 3204 |
28 Mar 2008 - current |
Egan, James Anthony Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
28 Mar 2008 - current |
Egan, Joan Lesley Individual |
Rd 9 Hamilton 3289 |
28 Mar 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Caroline Sharples Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034446232 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Hamilton East Hamilton 3216 |
28 Mar 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Egan, James Anthony Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
28 Mar 2008 - current |
Egan, Mary Elizabeth Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
28 Mar 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Egan, Simon Peter Individual |
Beachlands Auckland |
28 Mar 2008 - 22 Sep 2012 |
Egan, Peter James Individual |
Rd 9 Hamilton |
28 Mar 2008 - 03 Feb 2022 |
Egan, Peter James Individual |
Rd 9 Hamilton |
28 Mar 2008 - 03 Feb 2022 |
Egan, Peter James Individual |
Rd 9 Hamilton |
28 Mar 2008 - 03 Feb 2022 |
Egan, Peter James Individual |
Rd 9 Hamilton |
28 Mar 2008 - 03 Feb 2022 |
Egan, Peter James Individual |
Rd 9 Hamilton |
28 Mar 2008 - 03 Feb 2022 |
Egan, Peter James Individual |
Rd 9 Hamilton |
28 Mar 2008 - 03 Feb 2022 |
Arra Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033183855 Company Number: 1976440 Entity |
28 Mar 2008 - 22 Sep 2012 | |
Arra Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033183855 Company Number: 1976440 Entity |
28 Mar 2008 - 22 Sep 2012 | |
Da Silva, Carlos Manuel Individual |
Huntington Park Hamilton |
28 Mar 2008 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Egan, Caroline Marie Individual |
Rd 2 Papakura, Auckland 2582 |
08 Apr 2010 - 22 Sep 2012 |
Greenlea Group Livestock Limited 247 Kahikatea Drive |
|
Greenlea Group Limited 247 Kahikatea Drive |
|
Greenlea Premier Meats Limited 247 Kahikatea Drive |
|
Nature's Fresh Produce Limited 3/254 Kahikatea Drive |
|
Sicrhad Limited Greenlea Lane |
|
Gs Prime Limited 241 Kahikatea Drive |
Gallagher Holdings Limited Kahikatea Drive |
Gallagher Security (int) Limited Kahikatea Drive |
Real Time Genomics Limited Level 3, 18 London Street |
Pragma Group Limited 101 Greenwood Street |
Pragma Property Group Limited Unit 1, 101a Greenwood Street |
Thirst Traders Limited 120 Greenwood Street |