Nutrition Direct Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429032783278) was registered on 05 May 2008. 12 addresess are in use by the company: 6 Farrington Ave, Bishopdale, Christchurch, 8053 (type: registered, service). Suite 1, 301A Blenheim Road, Upper Riccarton, Christchurch had been their physical address, up until 16 Nov 2020. 100 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 16 shares (16 per cent of shares), namely:
Nesterovich, Alexandre Petrovich (an individual) located at Bishopdale, Christchurch postcode 8053. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 16 per cent of all shares (exactly 16 shares); it includes
Frolova, Elena Andreevna (an individual) - located at Bishopdale, Christchurch,
Frolova, Elena Andreevna (a director) - located at Bishopdale, Christchurch. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allocation (50 shares, 50%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Fox, Neil, located at Halswell, Christchurch (an individual). "Health supplement retailing" (business classification G427125) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Nutrition Direct Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
146 Dodson Valley Road, Atawhai, Nelson, 7010 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 02 Mar 2015 |
21 Findlay Avenue, Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 17 Jul 2019 |
Suite 1, 301a Blenheim Road, Upper Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 10 Mar 2020 |
502 Wairakei Road, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 06 Nov 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Vasilisa Frolova
Halswell, Christchurch, 8025
Address used since 26 Mar 2024 |
Director | 26 Mar 2024 - current |
Elena Andreevna Frolova
Bishopdale, Christchurch, 8053
Address used since 14 Mar 2019 |
Director | 14 Mar 2019 - 25 Mar 2024 |
Vasilisa Frolova
Atawhai, Nelson, 7010
Address used since 02 Mar 2015 |
Director | 05 May 2008 - 14 Mar 2019 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
502 Wairakei Road, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 06 Nov 2020 |
502 Wairakei Road, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Physical & registered & service | 16 Nov 2020 |
502 Wairakei Road, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Postal & office & delivery | 05 Mar 2021 |
6 Farrington Ave, Bishopdale, Christchurch, 8053 | Registered & service | 20 Apr 2023 |
502 Wairakei Road , Burnside , Christchurch , 8053 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Suite 1, 301a Blenheim Road, Upper Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 | Physical & registered | 18 Mar 2020 - 16 Nov 2020 |
21 Findlay Avenue, Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 | Registered & physical | 25 Jul 2019 - 18 Mar 2020 |
146 Dodson Valley Road, Atawhai, Nelson, 7010 | Physical | 10 Mar 2015 - 25 Jul 2019 |
146 Dodson Valley Road, Atawhai, Nelson, 7010 | Registered | 11 Mar 2014 - 25 Jul 2019 |
36 Macdonald Crescent, City, Wellington | Registered | 05 May 2008 - 11 Mar 2014 |
36 Macdonald Crescent, City, Wellington | Physical | 05 May 2008 - 10 Mar 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Nesterovich, Alexandre Petrovich Individual |
Bishopdale Christchurch 8053 |
23 Sep 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Frolova, Elena Andreevna Individual |
Bishopdale Christchurch 8053 |
23 Sep 2019 - current |
Frolova, Elena Andreevna Director |
Bishopdale Christchurch 8053 |
23 Sep 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fox, Neil Individual |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 |
05 May 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Frolova, Vasilisa Individual |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 |
05 May 2008 - current |
Nceax Limited 10 Strathaven Place |
|
Rhodes Rural Limited 14 Frenchay Drive |
|
Abiliquip Limited 23 Strathaven Place |
|
Belldervelt Holdings Limited 12 Farleigh Street |
|
Tasman Sheetmetal Limited 11 Burnside Terrace |
|
NZ Boat Sales Limited 7 Springlea Heights |
Posa & Cam Limited 126 Trafalgar Street |
O2b Healthy Limited 7 Elms Street |
Health 2000 Nelson Limited Unit 7, 219 Trafalgar Street |
Mountain Red Limited 8 Creswell Place |
Thermal Imaging South Island Limited 20 Pigeon Valley South Branch Rd2 |
Tri Health Natural Therapy Limited 177 High Street |