Dmt Dairies Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429032751611) was registered on 14 May 2008. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 287-293 Durham Street North, Christchurch, 8013 (type: physical, registered). 30 Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch had been their registered address, up until 12 Jul 2017. Dmt Dairies Limited used other names, namely: Whyduck Dairying Limited from 28 May 2008 to 24 Apr 2013, Dairy Duck Limited (14 May 2008 to 28 May 2008). 200 shares are allocated to 6 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 3 entities and holds 100 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Evans, Logan Rex (an individual) located at Rd 7, Gore postcode 9777,
Duckmanton, Jeremy Paul (an individual) located at Rd 2, Ashburton postcode 7772,
Webster, Nicola Ann (an individual) located at R D 11, Rakaia postcode 7781. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 49% of all shares (98 shares); it includes
Victoria Trustee Fw Limited (an entity) - located at Christchurch,
Duckmanton, Jeremy Paul (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Ashburton. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allotment (2 shares, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Duckmanton, Jeremy Paul, located at Rd 2, Ashburton (an individual). The Businesscheck information was last updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
287-293 Durham Street North, Christchurch, 8013 | Physical & registered & service | 12 Jul 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jeremy Paul Duckmanton
Rd 2, Ashburton, 7772
Address used since 01 Jun 2013 |
Director | 14 May 2008 - current |
Stacey Marie Duckmanton
Rd 2, Ashburton, 7772
Address used since 01 Jun 2013 |
Director | 24 Apr 2013 - 21 Nov 2019 |
Rebecca Jane Duckmanton
Rd 7, Ashburton, 7777
Address used since 24 Feb 2009 |
Director | 14 May 2008 - 09 Jun 2011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
30 Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Registered & physical | 28 Jan 2015 - 12 Jul 2017 |
1674 Thompsons Track, Rd 2, Ashburton, 7772 | Registered | 14 Feb 2014 - 28 Jan 2015 |
Suite 2, 21 Leslie Hills Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011 | Physical | 14 Feb 2014 - 28 Jan 2015 |
C/-goodman Steven Tavendale Reid, L1-96 Oxford Terrace, Christchurch | Physical | 03 Mar 2009 - 14 Feb 2014 |
434 Awaroa School Road, R D 7, Ashburton | Registered | 03 Mar 2009 - 14 Feb 2014 |
C/-goodman Steven Tavendale Reid, 96 Oxford Terrace, Christchurch | Physical | 14 May 2008 - 03 Mar 2009 |
C/-360 Mclachlans Road, R.d. 11, Rakaia | Registered | 14 May 2008 - 03 Mar 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Evans, Logan Rex Individual |
Rd 7 Gore 9777 |
15 Jan 2020 - current |
Duckmanton, Jeremy Paul Individual |
Rd 2 Ashburton 7772 |
14 May 2008 - current |
Webster, Nicola Ann Individual |
R D 11 Rakaia 7781 |
23 Jan 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Victoria Trustee Fw Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030587274 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Christchurch 8013 |
12 Apr 2013 - current |
Duckmanton, Jeremy Paul Individual |
Rd 2 Ashburton 7772 |
14 May 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Duckmanton, Jeremy Paul Individual |
Rd 2 Ashburton 7772 |
14 May 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Polson Higgs Nominees (2011) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031281874 Company Number: 3217709 Entity |
14 Jul 2011 - 12 Apr 2013 | |
Duckmanton, Rebecca Jane Individual |
R.d. 11, Rakaia |
14 May 2008 - 14 Jul 2011 |
Polson Higgs Nominees (2011) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031281874 Company Number: 3217709 Entity |
14 Jul 2011 - 12 Apr 2013 | |
Duckmanton, Stacey Marie Individual |
Rd 2 Ashburton 7772 |
23 Jan 2015 - 03 Dec 2019 |
Ealam, Joanne Wendy Individual |
Oxford |
14 May 2008 - 14 Jul 2011 |
Kitz Investments Limited 287-293 Durham Street North |
|
Roading And Building Cartage Limited 287-293 Durham Street North |
|
Weir Nominees Limited 287-293 Durham Street North |
|
Mackay Trustees 2013 Limited 287 - 293 Durham Street |
|
L & P Build Limited 287-293 Durham Street North, Christchurch Central |
|
Tai Tapu Milk Company Limited 287-293 Durham Street North |