Parkview Property Investments Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429032388725) was launched on 11 Mar 2009. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 27 Cashel Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 (type: registered, physical). Level 1, 270 St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch had been their registered address, until 24 Aug 2022. 120 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 120 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Matador Trustee Services Limited (an entity) located at Christchurch Central, Christchurch postcode 8011. The Businesscheck information was updated on 05 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
27 Cashel Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered & physical & service | 24 Aug 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Errol Wayne Bailey
Papanui, Christchurch, 8053
Address used since 01 Jul 2010 |
Director | 11 Mar 2009 - current |
David Ronald Kitson
Kennedys Bush, Christchurch, 8025
Address used since 12 Nov 2015 |
Director | 11 Mar 2009 - current |
Paul Henry Wouters
Fendalton, Christchurch, 8052
Address used since 01 Sep 2015 |
Director | 01 Sep 2015 - 26 Oct 2015 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 270 St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered & physical | 30 Jun 2021 - 24 Aug 2022 |
Level 1, 270 St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered & physical | 29 Apr 2019 - 30 Jun 2021 |
Level 1, 22 Foster Street, Addington,, Christchurch, 8011 | Physical & registered | 29 Aug 2011 - 29 Apr 2019 |
Taurus Group Limited, Level 3 Urs House, 287 Durham Street, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 11 Mar 2009 - 29 Aug 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Matador Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032455939 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8011 |
11 Mar 2009 - current |
Leighs Cockram Jv Limited Level 2, 219 High Street |
|
Reardon Holdings Limited Level 2, 205 Durham Street South |
|
Dravitzki Trustees Limited Level 2, 14 Dundas Street |
|
Delwyn Denton-lanauze Trustee Limited Level 2, 14 Dundas Street |
|
Manning Trustees Limited Level 2, 14 Dundas Street |
|
Ah Trust Co Limited Level 2, 14 Dundas Street |