Rfcad Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429032341102) was registered on 20 Mar 2009. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Suite 1, 202 Eastbourne Street West, Hastings, Hastings, 4122 (type: physical, registered). 107 Market Street South, Hastings had been their physical address, until 10 May 2018. 100 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 49 shares (49% of shares), namely:
Franklin, Richard Juha Louis (an individual) located at Havelock North, Havelock North postcode 4130. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 48% of all shares (exactly 48 shares); it includes
Mcilraith, Robyn Elizabeth (an individual) - located at Havelock North, Havelock North. Moving on to the next group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Franklin, Jessica Louise, located at Havelock North, Havelock North (an individual). The Businesscheck data was updated on 31 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Suite 1, 202 Eastbourne Street West, Hastings, Hastings, 4122 | Physical & registered & service | 10 May 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Richard Juha Louis Franklin
Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 11 Jul 2018
Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 29 Jul 2015 |
Director | 20 Mar 2009 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
107 Market Street South, Hastings, 4122 | Physical & registered | 02 Apr 2009 - 10 May 2018 |
Shepherd Hensman, 107 Market St South, 4122 Hasting | Registered | 20 Mar 2009 - 02 Apr 2009 |
Shepherd Hensman, 107 Market St South, 4122 Hastings | Physical | 20 Mar 2009 - 02 Apr 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Franklin, Richard Juha Louis Individual |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
20 Mar 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcilraith, Robyn Elizabeth Individual |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
20 Mar 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Franklin, Jessica Louise Individual |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
16 Nov 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Franklin, Louie Johan Individual |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
16 Nov 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Franklin, Laila Maria Individual |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
03 Sep 2013 - current |
G-group Limited 1/202 Eastbourne Street West |
|
Mark Foster Building Limited Suite 1, 202 Eastbourne Street West |
|
Spring Ventures Limited 1/202 Eastbourne Street West |
|
Spring Education Limited 1/202 Eastbourne Street West |
|
Rowan Brown Electrical Limited 1/202 Eastbourne St W |