Shed Full Of Junk Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429032328585) was launched on 27 Mar 2009. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 31 Anderson Road, Rd 3, Motueka, 7198 (type: physical, registered). 42 Mcgill Street, Rd 1, Westport had been their registered address, up to 27 Oct 2016. 1000 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 250 shares (25 per cent of shares), namely:
Koleff, Philip Angelov (an individual) located at Rd 3, Motueka postcode 7198. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 25 per cent of all shares (exactly 250 shares); it includes
Koleff, Louie Angelov (an individual) - located at Rd 3, Motueka. Next there is the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (250 shares, 25%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Koleff, Heather Anne, located at Rd 3, Motueka (an individual). The Businesscheck information was updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
31 Anderson Road, Rd 3, Motueka, 7198 | Physical & registered & service | 27 Oct 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Louie Angelov Koleff
Rd 3, Motueka, 7198
Address used since 18 Oct 2016 |
Director | 27 Mar 2009 - current |
Philip Angelov Koleff
Rd 3, Motueka, 7198
Address used since 03 Oct 2022
Rd1 Richmond, Nelson, 7081
Address used since 13 Oct 2015 |
Director | 27 Mar 2009 - current |
Heather Anne Koleff
Rd1 Richmond, Nelson, 7081
Address used since 13 Oct 2015 |
Director | 27 Mar 2009 - 30 Sep 2019 |
Ry Oliver Koleff
Toi Toi, Nelson, 7010
Address used since 18 Oct 2016 |
Director | 27 Mar 2009 - 30 Sep 2019 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
42 Mcgill Street, Rd 1, Westport, 7891 | Registered & physical | 09 Oct 2014 - 27 Oct 2016 |
216 Pugh Road, Rd1 Richmond, Nelson | Physical & registered | 27 Mar 2009 - 09 Oct 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Koleff, Philip Angelov Individual |
Rd 3 Motueka 7198 |
27 Mar 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Koleff, Louie Angelov Individual |
Rd 3 Motueka 7198 |
27 Mar 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Koleff, Heather Anne Individual |
Rd 3 Motueka 7198 |
27 Mar 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Koleff, Chelsea Individual |
Rd 3 Motueka 7198 |
15 Oct 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Koleff, Ry Oliver Individual |
Toi Toi Nelson 7010 |
27 Mar 2009 - 15 Oct 2019 |
Koleff Enterprises Limited 31 Anderson Road |
|
More Good To Do Limited 40 Little Sydney Road |
|
Kiwinui Limited 78b Little Sydney Road |
|
Ns Rogers (2014) Limited 408 Main Road |
|
Abel Tasman Educational Trust 420 Main Road |
|
Mcnabb Point Technical Limited 437 Main Road Riwaka |