Stillwater Hotel (2009) Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429032287202) was registered on 27 Apr 2009. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: 64 High Street, Greymouth, 7805 (type: registered, physical). 64 High Street, Greymouth had been their physical address, up to 18 Apr 2017. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 40 shares (40 per cent of shares), namely:
Burgess, Sandra (an individual) located at Rd 1, Arnold Valley postcode 7872. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 60 per cent of all shares (60 shares); it includes
Demanser, Roger (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Arnold Valley. Our database was last updated on 03 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
C/-marshall Heaphy, 64 High Street, Greymouth, 7805 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 08 Apr 2011 |
64 High Street, Greymouth, 7805 | Registered & physical & service | 18 Apr 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Roger Demanser
Rd 1, Arnold Valley, 7872
Address used since 23 Apr 2018
Stillwater, Greymouth, 7805
Address used since 15 Nov 2011 |
Director | 27 Apr 2009 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
64 High Street, Greymouth, 7805 | Physical | 05 May 2014 - 18 Apr 2017 |
64 High Street, Greymouth, 7805 | Registered | 02 May 2014 - 18 Apr 2017 |
C/-marshall Heaphy, 64 High Street, Greymouth, 7805 | Physical | 02 May 2014 - 05 May 2014 |
1376 State Highway 7, Stillwater, Greymouth, 7805 | Physical | 18 Apr 2011 - 02 May 2014 |
C/-marshall Heaphy, 64 High Street, Greymouth, 7805 | Registered | 18 Apr 2011 - 02 May 2014 |
44 Avenue Road, Timaru | Physical | 27 Apr 2009 - 18 Apr 2011 |
C/-marshall Heaphy, 129 Tainui Street, Greymouth | Registered | 27 Apr 2009 - 18 Apr 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Burgess, Sandra Individual |
Rd 1 Arnold Valley 7872 |
27 Apr 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Demanser, Roger Individual |
Rd 1 Arnold Valley 7872 |
27 Apr 2009 - current |
Kelshanbe Holdings Limited 64a High Street |
|
Digga Teck Limited 64 High Street |
|
M & H Trustee Seventeen Limited 64 High Street |
|
Max & Mary Trustees Limited 64a High Street |
|
Caldwell Fj Investments Limited 64 High Street |
|
Farwest Farming Limited 64 High Street |