Steamer Basin Properties Limited (NZBN 9429032280807) was incorporated on 12 May 2009. 1 address is in use by the company: 5B Avenger Crescent, Wigram, Christchurch, 8042 (type: registered, physical). 39 Jellicoe Street, Martinborough, Martinborough had been their registered address, up until 12 Oct 2020. 5000 shares are allocated to 8 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 4 entities and holds 1500 shares (30 per cent of shares), namely:
Mark Crosland (an individual) located at Broad Bay, Dunedin postcode 9014,
Heather Mitchell (an individual) located at Broad Bay, Dunedin postcode 9014,
Cook Allan Gibson Trustee Company Limited (an entity) located at Dunedin postcode 9016. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 10 per cent of all shares (500 shares); it includes
Allan Golden (an individual) - located at Kaikorai, Dunedin 9010. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (2000 shares, 40%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Mark Cameron, located at Port Chalmers 9023 (an individual). The Businesscheck data was last updated on 30 Mar 2022.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
5b Avenger Crescent, Wigram, Christchurch, 8042 | Registered & physical | 12 Oct 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Mark Gary Cameron
Port Chalmers, 9023
Address used since 15 Dec 2015 |
Director | 12 May 2009 - current |
Sandra Marie Cameron
Saint Clair, Dunedin, 9012
Address used since 01 Oct 2012 |
Director | 12 May 2009 - current |
David Allan Crosland
Broad Bay, Dunedin, 9014
Address used since 12 May 2009 |
Director | 12 May 2009 - current |
Allan James Golden
Kaikorai, Dunedin, 9010
Address used since 12 May 2009 |
Director | 12 May 2009 - current |
Barry John Cameron
R D 2, Mosgiel 9092,
Address used since 12 May 2009 |
Director | 12 May 2009 - 19 Sep 2010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
39 Jellicoe Street, Martinborough, Martinborough, 5711 | Registered & physical | 13 Jun 2016 - 12 Oct 2020 |
Level 5, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical | 12 May 2009 - 13 Jun 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mark Stephen Crosland Individual |
Broad Bay Dunedin 9014 |
12 May 2009 - current |
Heather Dawn Mitchell Individual |
Broad Bay Dunedin 9014 |
12 May 2009 - current |
Cook Allan Gibson Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038031595 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Dunedin 9016 |
12 May 2009 - current |
David Allan Crosland Individual |
Broad Bay Dunedin 9014 |
12 May 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Allan James Golden Individual |
Kaikorai Dunedin 9010 |
12 May 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mark Gary Cameron Individual |
Port Chalmers 9023 |
12 May 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hgw Trustee's Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037448110 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Dunedin Central Dunedin 9016 |
12 May 2009 - current |
Sandra Marie Cameron Individual |
Saint Clair Dunedin 9012 |
12 May 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Barry John Cameron Individual |
277 Tirohanga Road R D 2, Mosgiel 9092 |
12 May 2009 - 06 Oct 2010 |
Legion Trustees Limited 39 Jellicoe Street |
|
Booking Spaces Limited 39 Jellicoe Street |
|
Vra Limited 34 Jellicoe Street |
|
The Wairarapa Children's Trust Board C/o Rightway Limited |
|
Le Coiffeur Limited 29 Jellicoe Street |
|
South Coast Moana Limited 55 Venice Street |