Monash Holdings No 2 Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429032269307) was started on 05 May 2009. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 2999 Long Bay Road, Wyuna Bay, Coromandel, 3581 (type: registered, physical). Flat 213, 24 Wellington Street, Howick, Auckland had been their physical address, until 29 Jul 2020. 10 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 10 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Williams, Owen Neil (an individual) located at Wyuna Bay, Coromandel postcode 3581. The Businesscheck database was updated on 07 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2999 Long Bay Road, Wyuna Bay, Coromandel, 3581 | Registered & physical & service | 29 Jul 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Owen Neil Williams
Wyuna Bay, Coromandel, 3581
Address used since 21 Jul 2020
Howick, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 26 May 2016 |
Director | 05 May 2009 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Flat 213, 24 Wellington Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 | Physical & registered | 19 Jul 2016 - 29 Jul 2020 |
1st Floor, 101 Station Road, Penrose, Auckland | Physical & registered | 05 May 2009 - 19 Jul 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Williams, Owen Neil Individual |
Wyuna Bay Coromandel 3581 |
05 May 2009 - current |
Kroons Investments Limited 61 Picton Street |
|
Galbraiths Trustee Services Limited Unit 3, 18 Fencible Drive |
|
East Auckland All-power Charitable Trust 18 Fencible Drive |
|
Ovi Limited Unit 1, 46 Wellington Street |
|
Alpha Property Investments Limited 53 Picton Street |
|
Hallmark Jewellery Limited 53 Picton Street |