Farmers' Sustainable Meat Company Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429032203745) was launched on 02 Jul 2009. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 3 London Street, Hamilton Central, Hamilton, 3204 (type: registered, physical). 3 London Street, Hamilton Central, Hamilton had been their registered address, up to 20 Mar 2017. Farmers' Sustainable Meat Company Limited used other aliases, namely: Poriprime Limited from 02 Jul 2009 to 07 Apr 2011. 8000 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 8000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Chin, Luk Sun (an individual) located at Cambridge, Cambridge postcode 3434. Our data was updated on 03 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
3 London Street, Hamilton Central, Hamilton, 3204 | Registered & physical & service | 20 Mar 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paul Williams
Rd 8, Tauranga, 3180
Address used since 10 Mar 2016 |
Director | 02 Jul 2009 - current |
Luk Sun Chin
Cambridge, Cambridge, 3434
Address used since 18 Nov 2016 |
Director | 31 Mar 2011 - current |
Bill Gardiner
Kaimai, Tauranga,
Address used since 02 Jul 2009 |
Director | 02 Jul 2009 - 31 Mar 2011 |
Guy Howard Davey
Matua, Tauranga 3110,
Address used since 23 Feb 2010 |
Director | 02 Jul 2009 - 04 Mar 2011 |
Mahaki Ellis
Matapihi, Tauranga,
Address used since 02 Jul 2009 |
Director | 02 Jul 2009 - 12 Aug 2010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
3 London Street, Hamilton Central, Hamilton, 3204 | Registered & physical | 01 May 2012 - 20 Mar 2017 |
189 Collingwood Street, Hamilton Lake, Hamilton, 3204 | Physical & registered | 02 Apr 2012 - 01 May 2012 |
283 Raynes Road, Rd 2, Hamilton | Physical & registered | 15 Jul 2009 - 02 Apr 2012 |
C/-te Awanui Huka Pak Co-operative, Totara Street, Mount Maunganui | Physical & registered | 02 Jul 2009 - 15 Jul 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chin, Luk Sun Individual |
Cambridge Cambridge 3434 |
07 Apr 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Taikato, Puaaorangi Individual |
Maungatapu Tauranga |
02 Jul 2009 - 07 Apr 2011 |
Pahoia Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032276480 Company Number: 2237207 Entity |
07 Apr 2011 - 10 Sep 2012 | |
Ellis, Mahaki Individual |
Matapihi Tauranga |
02 Jul 2009 - 07 Apr 2011 |
Gardiner, Bill Individual |
Kaimai Tauranga |
02 Jul 2009 - 07 Apr 2011 |
Pahoia Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032276480 Company Number: 2237207 Entity |
07 Apr 2011 - 10 Sep 2012 | |
Minden Village Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032811353 Company Number: 2115519 Entity |
02 Jul 2009 - 07 Apr 2011 | |
Minden Village Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032811353 Company Number: 2115519 Entity |
02 Jul 2009 - 07 Apr 2011 | |
Tukaki, William Individual |
Nukuhou Taupo |
02 Jul 2009 - 07 Apr 2011 |
Dps Family Trustees Limited 3 London Street |
|
Mg Engineering Limited 3 London Street |
|
Read Think Learn Limited 3 London Street |
|
Papa Aroha Farms Limited 3 London Street |
|
Raglan Fish Limited 3 London Street |
|
Kaimai Farms Limited 3 London Street |