Gba Investment Group Limited (issued a business number of 9429032202984) was launched on 12 Jun 2009. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 55 Epsom Avenue, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 (type: physical, service). 55 Epsom Avenue, Epsom, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 24 Sep 2020. 500 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 500 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Chin, Rodney Sue Wing (an individual) located at Epsom, Auckland. The Businesscheck database was updated on 06 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
55 Epsom Avenue, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Registered | 22 Aug 2012 |
55 Epsom Avenue, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & service | 24 Sep 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Rodney Sue Wing Chin
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 05 Oct 2015 |
Director | 12 Jun 2009 - current |
Ross Hern Yen Chin
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 05 Oct 2015 |
Director | 12 Jun 2009 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
55 Epsom Avenue, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Physical | 22 Aug 2012 - 24 Sep 2020 |
C/-pkf Ross Melville, Level 5, 50 Anzac Avenue, Auckland 1010 | Physical & registered | 12 Jun 2009 - 22 Aug 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chin, Rodney Sue Wing Individual |
Epsom Auckland |
12 Jun 2009 - current |
Gbc Holdings Limited 55 Epsom Avenue |
|
Mana Trustee Co Limited 55 Epsom Avenue |
|
Vinelight Nominees Limited 55 Epsom Avenue |
|
195 Khyber Pass Rd Limited 55 Epsom Avenue |
|
Dilan Enterprises Limited Flat 2, 15 Shipherds Avenue |
|
Kindred Rest Home Limited 61 Epsom Avenue |