Caniwi Properties (Newmarket) Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429032168426) was registered on 09 Jul 2009. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 9, 111 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 (type: registered, physical). 111 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington had been their registered address, until 26 Oct 2021. Caniwi Properties (Newmarket) Limited used more names, namely: Caniwi Properties (High Street) Limited from 19 Apr 2010 to 29 Jun 2018, Caniwi Properties (Vincent) Limited (09 Jul 2009 to 19 Apr 2010). 40000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 20040 shares (50.1 per cent of shares), namely:
Caniwi Capital Partners Limited (an entity) located at Wellington Central, Wellington postcode 6011. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 49.9 per cent of all shares (exactly 19960 shares); it includes
Cumming, Geoffrey (an individual) - located at Level 33, Vero Centre, Shortland Street, Auckland. The Businesscheck information was updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 9, 111 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical & service | 26 Oct 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Troy Richard Bowker
Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 16 Aug 2022
Rd 1, Porirua, 5381
Address used since 03 Dec 2014
Kelburn, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 05 Mar 2019 |
Director | 09 Jul 2009 - current |
Desmond Joseph Gittings
Hataitai, Wellington, 6021
Address used since 09 Mar 2020
Hataitai, Wellington, 6021
Address used since 03 Mar 2013 |
Director | 30 Jul 2010 - current |
Matthew Anthony Fraser
Eastbourne, Wellington, 5013
Address used since 09 Jul 2009 |
Director | 09 Jul 2009 - 02 Aug 2010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
111 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 22 Oct 2021 - 26 Oct 2021 |
Level 16, 2 Hunter Street, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 11 Dec 2014 - 22 Oct 2021 |
Level 3, 11 Chews Lane, Wellington 6011 | Physical & registered | 26 Apr 2010 - 11 Dec 2014 |
C/-buddle Findlay, State Insurance Tower, 1 Willis Street, Wellington 6011 | Registered & physical | 09 Jul 2009 - 26 Apr 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Caniwi Capital Partners Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032544404 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Wellington Central Wellington 6011 |
09 Jul 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cumming, Geoffrey Individual |
Level 33, Vero Centre, Shortland Street Auckland 1010 |
01 Apr 2016 - current |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Caniwi Capital Partners Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 2176196 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Pooja Foods Limited Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay |
|
M G Bale Trustees (hill 16) Limited Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street |
|
Sounds Lifestyle Investments Limited Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street |
|
Customs Agents Wellington Limited Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay |
|
Ppem Nominees Limited Level 14, 1-3 Willeston Street |
|
Glading Family Trustees Limited Level 10, Greenock House, 39 The Terrace |