Heritage Arts Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429032124309) was registered on 31 Aug 1981. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 30 Whites Rd, Rd1, Howick, Howick, Auckland, 2571 (type: postal, office). Milne Maingay, 22 Station Road, Otahuhu had been their physical address, until 06 Sep 1999. 15000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 7500 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Jackson, Michael Ronald (an individual) located at Rd 1, Howick postcode 2571. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 7500 shares); it includes
Jackson, Merrilyn (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Howick. "Art dealing" (ANZSIC G427910) is the category the ABS issued to Heritage Arts Limited. The Businesscheck database was updated on 27 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2nd Floor, 15b Vestey Drive, Mt Wellington, Auckland, 1060 | Registered & physical & service | 06 Sep 1999 |
30 Whites Rd, Rd1, Howick, Howick, Auckland, 2571 | Postal | 08 Jul 2019 |
2nd Floor, 15b Vestey Drive, Mt Wellington, Auckland, 1060 | Office | 08 Jul 2019 |
30 Whites Road, Rd 1, Whitford, 2571 | Delivery | 08 Jul 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michael Ronald Jackson
Rd 1, Howick, 2571
Address used since 09 Dec 1989 |
Director | 09 Dec 1989 - current |
Merrilyn Jackson
Rd 1, Howick, 2571
Address used since 09 Dec 1989 |
Director | 09 Dec 1989 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
30 Whites Road, Rd 1, Whitford, 2571 | Delivery | 08 Jul 2019 |
2nd Floor, 15b Vestey Drive , Mt Wellington , Auckland , 1060 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Milne Maingay, 22 Station Road, Otahuhu | Physical & registered | 06 Sep 1999 - 06 Sep 1999 |
Milen Maingay, 22 Station Road, Otahuhu | Physical | 17 Jul 1998 - 06 Sep 1999 |
22 Station Road, Otahuhu | Registered | 21 Apr 1997 - 06 Sep 1999 |
Feriff & Milne, 7 Mason Ave, Otahuhu, Auckland 6 | Registered | 28 Jun 1996 - 21 Apr 1997 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jackson, Michael Ronald Individual |
Rd 1 Howick 2571 |
31 Aug 1981 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jackson, Merrilyn Individual |
Rd 1 Howick 2571 |
31 Aug 1981 - current |
Akron Distributors (2010) Limited Milne Maingay Chartered Accontants |
|
Whywouldntya Limited Milne Maingay Chartered Accoutants |
|
Bogun Trust Company Limited Milne Maingay |
|
Jgg Trustee Company Limited Milne Maingay |
|
P & N Financial Services Limited Milne Maingay |
|
Print Machinery Limited Milne Maingay |
New Zealand Chinese Arts Transmission Limited 52 Milano Boulevard |
Maria Batiz Fine Art Restoration Limited 2 Crescent Road |
Fine Art Limited 3 Komaru Street |
John Leech Gallery Limited Cnr Kitchener And Wellesley St |
Acch Limited 1a Riverview Road |
Birdseye Limited 37 Cowan St, |