Leaders Hawke's Bay Limited (NZBN 9429032059601) was registered on 03 Aug 2009. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 123 Vogel Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 (type: physical, service). 110 Vogel Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin had been their registered address, until 01 Mar 2021. Leaders Hawke's Bay Limited used other aliases, namely: Leaders Hawkes Bay Limited from 12 Sep 2019 to 20 May 2020, Leaders Bay Cities Limited (04 Nov 2009 to 12 Sep 2019) and Sam Macdonald Real Estate Limited (08 Oct 2009 - 04 Nov 2009). 120 shares are issued to 7 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.83 per cent of shares), namely:
Macdonald, Samuel Alistair (an individual) located at Hospital Hill, Napier postcode 4110. In the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 19.17 per cent of all shares (exactly 23 shares); it includes
Macdonald Independent Trustees Limited (an entity) - located at Hospital Hill, Napier,
Macdonald, Samuel Alistair (an individual) - located at Hospital Hill, Napier. The next group of shareholders, share allotment (94 shares, 78.33%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Gaunt, David Sanderson, located at Hospital Hill, Napier (an individual),
Macdonald, Elanor Jean, located at Hospital Hill, Napier (a director). Businesscheck's data was updated on 29 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
7 Burlington Road, Napier, New Zealand | Other (Address For Share Register) & records & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 03 Aug 2009 |
123 Vogel Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Physical & service & registered | 01 Mar 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Elanor Jean Macdonald
Hospital Hill, Napier, 4110
Address used since 26 Oct 2012 |
Director | 09 Dec 2010 - current |
Samuel Alistair Macdonald
Hospital Hill, Napier, 4110
Address used since 01 Apr 2023 |
Director | 01 Apr 2023 - current |
Samuel Alistair Macdonald
Ahuriri, Napier, 4110
Address used since 26 Oct 2012 |
Director | 03 Aug 2009 - 01 Feb 2013 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
110 Vogel Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical | 20 Jun 2018 - 01 Mar 2021 |
Corner Vogel And Jetty Streets, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical | 19 Apr 2018 - 20 Jun 2018 |
Corner Vogel And Jetty Streets, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered | 10 May 2016 - 19 Apr 2018 |
5 Crawford Street, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered | 03 Sep 2014 - 10 May 2016 |
7 Burlington Road, Napier | Registered | 03 Aug 2009 - 03 Sep 2014 |
7 Burlington Road, Napier | Physical | 03 Aug 2009 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Macdonald, Samuel Alistair Individual |
Hospital Hill Napier 4110 |
24 Apr 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Macdonald Independent Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030320109 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Hospital Hill Napier 4110 |
24 Apr 2023 - current |
Macdonald, Samuel Alistair Individual |
Hospital Hill Napier 4110 |
24 Apr 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gaunt, David Sanderson Individual |
Hospital Hill Napier 4110 |
29 Aug 2013 - current |
Macdonald, Elanor Jean Director |
Hospital Hill Napier 4110 |
29 Aug 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Macdonald, Elanor Jean Director |
Hospital Hill Napier 4110 |
29 Aug 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gaunt, David Sanderson Individual |
Hospital Hill Napier 4110 |
29 Aug 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Calvert, Hilary Jane Individual |
Opoho Dunedin 9010 |
29 Aug 2013 - 08 Jul 2016 |
Macdonald, Samuel Alistair Individual |
Ahuriri Napier 4110 |
03 Aug 2009 - 29 Aug 2013 |
Nettleton And Company Limited Cnr Vogel & Jetty Streets |
|
Cameron Wool Limited Cnr Vogel And Jetty Streets |
|
Rotary Club Of Dunedin Central Charitable Trust Board Gallaway Cook Allan |
|
Warbirds Over Wanaka Community Trust Board Gallaway Cook Allan |
|
Kuracloud Limited 77 Vogel Street |
|
Kura Research Limited 77 Vogel Street |