23 Frederick Street Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429031858151) was registered on 07 Oct 2009. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 719 Tuki Tuki Road, Rd 12, Havelock North, 4294 (type: postal, delivery). 25 Frederick Street, Te Aro, Wellington had been their physical address, up until 28 Mar 2017. 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Baylis, Mark Alan (an individual) located at Havelock North postcode 4294. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 500 shares); it includes
Miller, Lucy Rose (an individual) - located at Havelock North. "Investment - residential property" (ANZSIC L671150) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued 23 Frederick Street Limited. Our database was updated on 20 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
719 Tuki Tuki Road, Tuki Tuki, Havelock North, 4294 | Registered & physical & service | 28 Mar 2017 |
719 Tuki Tuki Road, Rd 12, Havelock North, 4294 | Postal | 17 May 2019 |
719 Tuki Tuki Road, Tuki Tuki, Havelock North, 4294 | Delivery & office | 17 May 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Lucy Rose Miller
Havelock North, 4294
Address used since 01 Apr 2017 |
Director | 07 Oct 2009 - current |
Mark Alan Baylis
Havelock North, 4294
Address used since 01 Apr 2017 |
Director | 07 Oct 2009 - current |
719 Tuki Tuki Road , Tuki Tuki , Havelock North , 4294 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
25 Frederick Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Physical | 12 Mar 2015 - 28 Mar 2017 |
25 Frederick Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Registered | 11 Aug 2014 - 28 Mar 2017 |
25 Frederick Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Physical | 11 Aug 2014 - 12 Mar 2015 |
6th Floor, 95 Customhouse Quay, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 08 Nov 2013 - 11 Aug 2014 |
3rd Floor, 85 The Terrace, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 04 Apr 2013 - 08 Nov 2013 |
3rd Floor, 85 The Terrace, Wellington, 6011 | Registered | 06 Jul 2010 - 04 Apr 2013 |
25 Frederick Street, Te Aro, Wellington 6011 | Physical | 07 Oct 2009 - 04 Apr 2013 |
25 Frederick Street, Te Aro, Wellington 6011 | Registered | 07 Oct 2009 - 06 Jul 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Baylis, Mark Alan Individual |
Havelock North 4294 |
07 Oct 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Miller, Lucy Rose Individual |
Havelock North 4294 |
07 Oct 2009 - current |
Gourmet Stay Limited 719 Tuki Tuki Road |
|
Ward Leikis Limited 655 Tuki Tuki Road |
|
Art Deco Masonic Limited 745 Tuki Tuki Road |
|
Napier Hotels Limited 745 Tuki Tuki Road |
|
Learning Strategies Limited 93 River Road |
|
Te Mata Consultants Limited River Road |
Affitasi Limited 33 Percy Berry Place |
Elpine Investments Limited 9 Belmont Street |
Torea Tai Investments Limited 3 James Cook Street |
Coventry Limited 6 Te Mata Peak Road |
Brecon Properties Limited 32 Tokomaru Drive |
Machlex Investments Limited 30 Mchardy Street |