Transworld Motors Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429031855181) was launched on 25 Feb 1974. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 3 Picton Avenue, Addington, Christchurch, 8011 (type: registered, physical). 3 Picton Avenue, Addington, Christchurch had been their registered address, until 29 Jun 2022. Transworld Motors Limited used other names, namely: Integrity Cars International Limited from 25 Feb 1974 to 29 Aug 1991. 4000 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 240 shares (6 per cent of shares), namely:
Rea, Lynda Ruth (an individual) located at Wakatu, Nelson postcode 7011. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 14 per cent of all shares (exactly 560 shares); it includes
Rea, Timothy Michael (an individual) - located at Wakatu, Nelson. Moving on to the next group of shareholders, share allocation (3200 shares, 80%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Outram, Susan Mary, located at Saint Albans, Christchurch (an individual),
Rea, Timothy Michael, located at Wakatu, Nelson (an individual). Businesscheck's data was updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
3 Picton Avenue, Addington, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered & physical & service | 29 Jun 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Lynda Ruth Rea
Wakatu, Nelson, 7011
Address used since 22 Jan 2021
Tata Beach, Takaka, 7183
Address used since 05 Aug 2020
Burnside, Christchurch, 8053
Address used since 11 Jun 2020
Richmond, Nelson, 7020
Address used since 24 Jun 2010
Burnside, Christchurch, 8053
Address used since 21 May 2020 |
Director | 18 Dec 1991 - current |
Timothy Michael Rea
Wakatu, Nelson, 7011
Address used since 22 Jan 2021
Tata Beach, Takaka, 7183
Address used since 05 Aug 2020
Burnside, Christchurch, 8053
Address used since 11 Jun 2020
Richmond, Nelson, 7020
Address used since 24 Jun 2010
Burnside, Christchurch, 8053
Address used since 21 May 2020 |
Director | 18 Dec 1991 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
3 Picton Avenue, Addington, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered & physical | 01 Nov 2021 - 29 Jun 2022 |
222 Memorial Avenue, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Registered | 19 Dec 2012 - 01 Nov 2021 |
222 Memorial Avenue, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Physical | 09 Jun 2011 - 01 Nov 2021 |
379 Hill Street, Richmond, Nelson 7020 | Registered | 14 Apr 2010 - 19 Dec 2012 |
H P Hanna & Co, 37 Latimer Square, Christchurch | Registered | 26 Nov 1997 - 14 Apr 2010 |
171 Moorhouse Avenue, Christchurch | Registered | 30 May 1997 - 26 Nov 1997 |
37 Latimer Square, Christchurch | Physical | 29 May 1997 - 09 Jun 2011 |
50 Manchester Street, Christchurch | Registered | 28 Jul 1992 - 30 May 1997 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rea, Lynda Ruth Individual |
Wakatu Nelson 7011 |
25 Feb 1974 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rea, Timothy Michael Individual |
Wakatu Nelson 7011 |
25 Feb 1974 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Outram, Susan Mary Individual |
Saint Albans Christchurch 8014 |
25 Feb 1974 - current |
Rea, Timothy Michael Individual |
Wakatu Nelson 7011 |
25 Feb 1974 - current |
Madison Cost Consultants Limited 222 Memorial Avenue |
|
Espinto Limited 222 Memorial Avenue |
|
K J Bensemann Limited 222 Memorial Avenue |
|
Southern English Developments Limited 222 Memorial Avenue |
|
Becker Construction Limited 222 Memorial Avenue |
|
The Weaver Foundation Incorporated 222 Memorial Avenue |