Manmeet Enterprises Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429031733243) was launched on 07 Dec 2009. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 41 Middlefield Drive, East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016 (type: physical, registered). 65 Redcastle Drive, East Tamaki, Manukau had been their registered address, until 02 Aug 2013. Manmeet Enterprises Limited used other aliases, namely: Manmeet Enerprises Limited from 07 Dec 2009 to 15 Mar 2010. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Singh, Gagandip (a director) located at Randwick Park, Manukau postcode 2105. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
41 Middlefield Drive, East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016 | Other (Address For Share Register) & records & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 25 Jul 2013 |
41 Middlefield Drive, East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016 | Physical & registered & service | 02 Aug 2013 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Gagandip Singh
Randwick Park, Manukau, 2105
Address used since 28 Sep 2010 |
Director | 01 Aug 2010 - current |
Ishmeet Kaur
Papatoetoe, Auckland, 2025
Address used since 01 Jul 2010 |
Director | 01 Jul 2010 - 01 Aug 2010 |
Anand Singh
Takanini,
Address used since 07 Dec 2009 |
Director | 07 Dec 2009 - 02 Jul 2010 |
Paramdeep Kaur Sarna
Papatoetoe,
Address used since 07 Dec 2009 |
Director | 07 Dec 2009 - 30 Jun 2010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
65 Redcastle Drive, East Tamaki, Manukau, 2013 | Registered & physical | 27 Sep 2010 - 02 Aug 2013 |
2/79 Hillcrest Road, Paptoetoe, Auckland, 2016 | Registered & physical | 02 Aug 2010 - 27 Sep 2010 |
213 Kilkenny Dr, Dannemora, Auckland | Physical & registered | 07 Dec 2009 - 02 Aug 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Singh, Gagandip Director |
Randwick Park Manukau 2105 |
17 Sep 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kaur, Ishmeet Individual |
Papatoetoe Auckland 2025 |
01 Jul 2010 - 17 Sep 2010 |
Singh, Anand Individual |
Takanini |
07 Dec 2009 - 01 Jul 2010 |
Sarna, Paramdeep Kaur Individual |
Papatoetoe |
07 Dec 2009 - 01 Jul 2010 |
Roshan Trustee Limited 41 Middlefield Drive |
|
Lovely Investments Limited 41 Middlefield Drive |
|
786 Holdings Limited 41 Middlefield Drive |
|
Dippy's Group Limited 41 Middlefield Drive |
|
Avtar Singh & Sons Pvt. Limited 41 Middlefield Drive |
|
Industrial Specialties(inspecs) Limited 41 Middlefield Drive |