Kc May Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429031699877) was registered on 09 Feb 2010. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Kpmg, 10Th Floor Kpmg Centre, 85 Alexandra Street, Hamilton (type: registered, physical). Kc May Limited used other aliases, namely: Casey May Williams Limited from 09 Feb 2010 to 23 Apr 2015. 1000 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 3 entities and holds 900 shares (90 per cent of shares), namely:
Dti Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Hamilton postcode 3240,
Kopua, Casey May (a director) located at Rd 2, Matamata postcode 3472,
Kopua, Terry Jade Tamihere (an individual) located at Rd 2, Matamata postcode 3472. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 10 per cent of all shares (exactly 100 shares); it includes
Kopua, Casey May (a director) - located at Rd 2, Matamata. Our database was updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Kpmg, 10th Floor Kpmg Centre, 85 Alexandra Street, Hamilton | Registered & physical & service | 09 Feb 2010 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Casey May Williams
Rototuna, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 27 Feb 2012 |
Director | 09 Feb 2010 - current |
Casey May Kopua
Rd 2, Matamata, 3472
Address used since 09 Feb 2022
Rd 2, Hamilton, 3882
Address used since 17 Feb 2020
Hamilton East, Hamilton, 3216
Address used since 05 Feb 2018
Rototuna, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 27 Feb 2012 |
Director | 09 Feb 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dti Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030242739 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Hamilton 3240 |
28 Aug 2017 - current |
Kopua, Casey May Director |
Rd 2 Matamata 3472 |
31 Aug 2017 - current |
Kopua, Terry Jade Tamihere Individual |
Rd 2 Matamata 3472 |
28 Aug 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kopua, Casey May Director |
Rd 2 Matamata 3472 |
31 Aug 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Williams, Murray Groves Individual |
R D 3 Matamata 3473 |
09 Feb 2010 - 28 Aug 2017 |
Wiltshire, John Robert Individual |
Queenwood Hamilton 3210 |
09 Feb 2010 - 01 Aug 2011 |
Williams, Casey May Individual |
Rototuna Hamilton 3210 |
09 Feb 2010 - 31 Aug 2017 |
Br Legal Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036302833 Company Number: 1244577 Entity |
01 Aug 2011 - 28 Aug 2017 | |
Br Legal Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036302833 Company Number: 1244577 Entity |
01 Aug 2011 - 28 Aug 2017 | |
Eshuis, Wessel Fouke Individual |
Hamilton East Hamilton 3216 |
09 Feb 2010 - 01 Aug 2011 |
Dunstan Nutrition Limited Kpmg |
|
Cairn Venture Limited Kpmg Centre, 85 Alexandra Street |
|
Mori International New Zealand Limited Kpmg, Level 10 |
|
Parklands Turf Limited Kpmg Centre, 85 Alexandra Street |
|
Alderman Drive Food Warehouse Limited Kpmg, Level 10, Kpmg Centre |
|
Ferguson Consultants Limited Kpmg Centre, 85 Alexandra Street |