Glenark Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429031658232) was launched on 22 Feb 2010. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 5, 110 Symonds Streets, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, physical). 303A Walton Road, Rd 1, Richmond Downs had been their registered address, up until 05 May 2021. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Eisig, Mark Heinz (a director) located at Rd 2, Matamata postcode 3472. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Gairdner, Glenn Leslie (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Matamata. Businesscheck's information was updated on 01 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 5, 110 Symonds Streets, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical & service | 05 May 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Mark Heinz Eisig
Rd 2, Matamata, 3472
Address used since 26 Apr 2022
Te Aroha, Te Aroha, 3320
Address used since 27 Apr 2021
Rd 5, Orere Point, 2585
Address used since 02 May 2018
Rd 3, Papakura, 2583
Address used since 19 May 2015
Rd 1, Richmond Downs, 3475
Address used since 03 May 2019 |
Director | 22 Feb 2010 - current |
Glenn Leslie Gairdner
Rd 2, Matamata, 3472
Address used since 26 Apr 2022
Te Aroha, Te Aroha, 3320
Address used since 27 Apr 2021
Rd 5, Orere Point, 2585
Address used since 02 May 2018
Rd 3, Papakura, 2583
Address used since 19 May 2015
Rd 1, Richmond Downs, 3475
Address used since 03 May 2019 |
Director | 06 Sep 2012 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
303a Walton Road, Rd 1, Richmond Downs, 3475 | Registered & physical | 13 May 2019 - 05 May 2021 |
98 Howard Road, Rd 5, Orere Point, 2585 | Registered & physical | 10 May 2018 - 13 May 2019 |
123 Heald Road, Rd 3, Papakura, 2583 | Registered & physical | 27 May 2015 - 10 May 2018 |
216 Ness Valley Road, Rd 5, Papakura, 2585 | Registered & physical | 29 Jul 2011 - 27 May 2015 |
11a Lexington Drive, Howick | Registered & physical | 22 Feb 2010 - 29 Jul 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Eisig, Mark Heinz Director |
Rd 2 Matamata 3472 |
15 May 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gairdner, Glenn Leslie Individual |
Rd 2 Matamata 3472 |
22 Feb 2010 - current |
Crusty Busty Rusty Grey Lynn Limited 30 Heald Rd |
|
Crusty, Busty & Rusty Holdings Limited 30 Heald Road |
|
Dick Bon Dickie Limited 30 Heald Road |
|
Crossbreed Farms Limited 2198a Hunua Road |
|
Gj Building Limited 2025 Hunua Road |
|
Pavilion Homes Limited 39 Mcmurray Road |