Lynley Reid Limited (NZBN 9429031378000) was incorporated on 05 Oct 2010. 7 addresess are in use by the company: 44 York Place, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 (type: registered, service). 8 Mawson Avenue, Kerikeri had been their service address, until 12 Jun 2023. 10000 shares are issued to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 4900 shares (49 per cent of shares), namely:
Reid Trustees 224095 Limited (an entity) located at Dunedin Central, Dunedin postcode 9016,
Reid, Lynley Jane (an individual) located at Rd 3, Kerikeri postcode 0293. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 5000 shares); it includes
Reid, Lynley Jane (an individual) - located at Rd 3, Kerikeri. Next there is the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (100 shares, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Reid, Lynley Jane, located at Rd 3, Kerikeri (an individual). "Restaurant operation" (ANZSIC H451130) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Lynley Reid Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 28 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
55 Waipapa West Road, Rd 2, Kerikeri, 0295 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 04 Apr 2016 |
55 Waipapa West Road, Rd 2, Kerikeri, 0295 | Physical | 12 Apr 2016 |
Po Box 158, Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0245 | Postal | 27 Jun 2019 |
8 Mawson Avenue, Kerikeri, 0230 | Other (Address For Share Register) & records & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 21 Oct 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Lynley Jane Reid
Rd 3, Kerikeri, 0293
Address used since 14 Jun 2012 |
Director | 05 Oct 2010 - current |
Glenis Anne Sim
Milton, Milton, 9220
Address used since 27 Mar 2016 |
Director | 27 Mar 2016 - 05 Apr 2019 |
John Warren Sim
Milton, Milton, 9220
Address used since 27 Mar 2016 |
Director | 27 Mar 2016 - 05 Apr 2019 |
Karen Ruth Reid
Mosgiel, Mosgiel, 9024
Address used since 01 Jan 2018 |
Director | 01 Jan 2018 - 05 Apr 2019 |
Malcolm Douglas Reid
Mosgiel, Mosgiel, 9024
Address used since 01 Jan 2018 |
Director | 01 Jan 2018 - 05 Apr 2019 |
Paul Curtis Wright
Rd 4, Taumarunui, 3994
Address used since 19 Nov 2010 |
Director | 05 Oct 2010 - 23 Feb 2012 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
8 Mawson Avenue, Kerikeri, 0230 | Other (Address For Share Register) & records & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 21 Oct 2022 |
44 York Place, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & service | 12 Jun 2023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
8 Mawson Avenue, Kerikeri, 0230 | Service | 17 Nov 2022 - 12 Jun 2023 |
8 Mawson Avenue, Kerikeri, 0230 | Registered | 01 Nov 2022 - 12 Jun 2023 |
55 Waipapa West Road, Rd 2, Kerikeri, 0295 | Registered | 12 Apr 2016 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Level 1, 4 Vinery Lane, Whangarei, 0110 | Registered & physical | 05 Nov 2014 - 12 Apr 2016 |
108 Kerikeri Road, Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 | Registered & physical | 01 Oct 2013 - 05 Nov 2014 |
108 Kerikeri Road, Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0245 | Registered & physical | 11 Sep 2013 - 01 Oct 2013 |
108 Kerikeri Road, Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 | Registered | 29 Jun 2011 - 11 Sep 2013 |
108 Kerikeri Road, Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 | Registered | 05 Oct 2010 - 29 Jun 2011 |
108 Kerikeri Road, Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 | Physical | 05 Oct 2010 - 11 Sep 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Reid Trustees 224095 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051352110 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Dunedin Central Dunedin 9016 |
18 Sep 2023 - current |
Reid, Lynley Jane Individual |
Rd 3 Kerikeri 0293 |
05 Oct 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Reid, Lynley Jane Individual |
Rd 3 Kerikeri 0293 |
05 Oct 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Reid, Lynley Jane Individual |
Rd 3 Kerikeri 0293 |
05 Oct 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Eastlake, Rebecca Anne Individual |
Kerikeri 0230 |
01 Mar 2017 - 18 Sep 2023 |
Wright, Paul Curtis Individual |
Rd 4 Taumarunui 3994 |
05 Oct 2010 - 14 Mar 2012 |
Byers, Peter William Individual |
Rd 2 Kaikohe 0472 |
05 Oct 2010 - 01 Mar 2017 |
Paul Curtis Wright Director |
Rd 4 Taumarunui 3994 |
05 Oct 2010 - 14 Mar 2012 |
Pw And Ja Lock Trustee Limited 72 Waipapa West Road |
|
Gwgg Limited 7 Waipapa West Road |
|
Ramie Enterprises Limited 124a Waipapa West Road |
|
M & S Concrete Contractors Limited 17 Ness Road |
|
Greil Contracting Limited 64 Jennings Road |
|
Primetime Charters And Gamefishing Limited Conifer Lane |
Tranzcom International Limited 49e Stanners Road |
Set The Sail Limited 13 Mawson Avenue |
The Orange Dining Room Limited 41 Amokura Drive |
Jerusalem Limited 22 Kendall Road |
Aryan Sorout 2015 Enterprises Limited 34 Mission Road |
Vinnies Sauce Limited 9 Hobson Avenue |