Kingston Corner Cafe & Bar Limited (NZBN 9429031340922) was launched on 26 Oct 2010. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 24 Main Street, Gore, 9710 (type: registered, service). 33A Main Street, Gore, Gore had been their registered address, until 31 Jan 2022. Kingston Corner Cafe & Bar Limited used other names, namely: Km Enterprises 2010 Limited from 14 Oct 2010 to 15 Dec 2015. 100 shares are issued to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 16 shares (16 per cent of shares), namely:
Miller, Paul Raymond (a director) located at Queenstown postcode 9300. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 67 per cent of all shares (67 shares); it includes
Miller, Paul Raymond (a director) - located at Queenstown,
Miller, Tony Norman (an individual) - located at Gore, Gore. The next group of shareholders, share allotment (17 shares, 17%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Kislinger, Tomas, located at Queenstown (an individual). "Investment - commercial property" (business classification L671230) is the category the ABS issued Kingston Corner Cafe & Bar Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 22 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
24 Main Street, Gore, 9710 | Physical & registered & service | 31 Jan 2022 |
24 Main Street, Gore, 9710 | Registered & service | 26 Jun 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paul Raymond Miller
Queenstown, 9300
Address used since 23 Apr 2018
Kingston, Garston, 9300
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 26 Oct 2010 - current |
Scott Alexander King
350 Craigie Road, Rd 1, Gore, 9771
Address used since 30 Jun 2014 |
Director | 26 Oct 2010 - 04 Sep 2015 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
33a Main Street, Gore, Gore, 9710 | Registered & physical | 05 Mar 2015 - 31 Jan 2022 |
10 Mersey Street, Gore, Gore, 9710 | Registered & physical | 26 Oct 2010 - 05 Mar 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Miller, Paul Raymond Director |
Queenstown 9300 |
26 Oct 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Miller, Paul Raymond Director |
Queenstown 9300 |
26 Oct 2010 - current |
Miller, Tony Norman Individual |
Gore Gore 9710 |
26 May 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kislinger, Tomas Individual |
Queenstown 9300 |
03 Dec 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
King, Alexander Steven Individual |
Gore Gore 9710 |
26 Oct 2010 - 12 Jun 2017 |
King, Scott Alexander Individual |
350 Craigie Road, Rd 1 Gore 9771 |
26 Oct 2010 - 12 Jun 2017 |
Flooring Plus Limited 33a Main Street |
|
Capri Restaurant Limited 33a Main Street |
|
Gaines Farming Limited 33a Main Street |
|
Gtm Developments Limited 33a Main Street |
|
Bw & Lm Falconer Limited 33a Main Street |
|
Teviot Valley Rest Home Incorporated C/o Bevan Pearce & Associates Limited |
Gtm Developments Limited 33a Main Street |
Strella Limited 22 Traford Street |
Impact Property Group Limited 213 Ward Street |
Cass St Recycling Limited 35 Inglewood Road |
Lkr Holdings Limited Level 1, 20 Don Street |
T.c. Greeny Buildings Limited 198 Spey Street |