Chapman Property Investments (Dunedin) Limited (NZBN 9429031293662) was registered on 30 Nov 2010. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 248 Cumberland Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 (type: registered, physical). Level 8, John Wickliffe House, 265 Princes Street, Dunedin had been their registered address, up until 13 Jun 2018. 100 shares are issued to 8 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 3 entities and holds 33 shares (33 per cent of shares), namely:
Chapman, Joseph Mark (an individual) located at Mosgiel, Mosgiel postcode 9024,
Chapman, Jodi Chantelle (an individual) located at Mosgiel, Mosgiel postcode 9024,
Chapman, Anthony Gerard (a director) located at Mosgiel, Mosgiel postcode 9024. In the second group, a total of 3 shareholders hold 34 per cent of all shares (34 shares); it includes
Chapman, Lynette Kay (an individual) - located at Mosgiel, Mosgiel,
Chapman, Anthony Gerard (a director) - located at Mosgiel, Mosgiel,
Chapman, Joseph Mark (an individual) - located at Mosgiel, Mosgiel. Next there is the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (33 shares, 33%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Chapman, Philip Joseph, located at Mosgiel, Mosgiel (an individual),
Philip Chapman, located at Mosgiel, Mosgiel (a director). "Rental of residential property" (business classification L671160) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Chapman Property Investments (Dunedin) Limited. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 05 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
248 Cumberland Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical & service | 13 Jun 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Anthony Gerard Chapman
Mosgiel, Mosgiel, 9024
Address used since 30 Nov 2010 |
Director | 30 Nov 2010 - current |
Joseph Mark Chapman
Mosgiel, Mosgiel, 9024
Address used since 30 Sep 2020 |
Director | 30 Sep 2020 - current |
Philip Joseph Chapman
Mosgiel, Mosgiel, 9024
Address used since 30 Nov 2010 |
Director | 30 Nov 2010 - 30 Sep 2020 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 8, John Wickliffe House, 265 Princes Street, Dunedin, 9054 | Registered & physical | 30 Nov 2010 - 13 Jun 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chapman, Joseph Mark Individual |
Mosgiel Mosgiel 9024 |
30 Jun 2016 - current |
Chapman, Jodi Chantelle Individual |
Mosgiel Mosgiel 9024 |
18 Feb 2020 - current |
Chapman, Anthony Gerard Director |
Mosgiel Mosgiel 9024 |
30 Nov 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chapman, Lynette Kay Individual |
Mosgiel Mosgiel 9024 |
30 Nov 2010 - current |
Chapman, Anthony Gerard Director |
Mosgiel Mosgiel 9024 |
30 Nov 2010 - current |
Chapman, Joseph Mark Individual |
Mosgiel Mosgiel 9024 |
30 Jun 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chapman, Philip Joseph Individual |
Mosgiel Mosgiel 9024 |
30 Nov 2010 - current |
Philip Joseph Chapman Director |
Mosgiel Mosgiel 9024 |
30 Nov 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Webb Farry Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037455095 Company Number: 985076 Entity |
30 Nov 2010 - 30 Jun 2016 | |
Webb Farry Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037455095 Company Number: 985076 Entity |
30 Nov 2010 - 30 Jun 2016 |
Vision Chartered Accountants Trustees Limited 265 Princes Street |
|
Emtech Limited Level 7, John Wickliffe House |
|
Rocklands Rural Water Scheme Limited 265 Princes Street |
|
Downies Trustee (no. 2) Limited 265 Princes Street |
|
Wrights Honey And Pollination Limited 265 Princes Street |
|
Nelson Plasterboard Services Limited Level 7 John Wickliffe House |
Real Estate Limited 265 Princes Street |
Eskvale Developments Limited Level 7, John Wickliffe House |
Black Tulip Investments Limited 118 High Street |
Get Up & Go Property Limited 6th Floor Consultancy House |
Ocms Joint Venture Properties Limited 7 Bond Street |
Gj And Jm Mcskimming Limited 6th Floor Consultancy House |