Encom Industries Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429031236928) was started on 27 Jan 2011. 6 addresess are currently in use by the company: 9 Sunlight Grove, Kenepuru, Porirua, 5022 (type: service, registered). 10 Sunlight Grove, Kenepuru, Porirua had been their service address, up to 20 May 2024. Encom Industries Limited used other aliases, namely: Stripeit.xyz Limited from 18 May 2016 to 23 Nov 2016, Stripe The Web Limited (10 Apr 2012 to 18 May 2016) and Matt Gunn Web Development Limited (27 Jan 2011 - 10 Apr 2012). 8500 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 8500 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Gunn, Matthew Robert (a director) located at Churton Park, Wellington postcode 6037. Our data was last updated on 06 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2/25 Kitchener Terrace, Johnsonville, Wellington, 6013 | Physical | 08 Jul 2022 |
10 Sunlight Grove, Kenepuru, Porirua, 5022 | Registered | 17 Apr 2023 |
Unit 1, 9 Sunlight Grove, Kenepuru, Porirua, 5022 | Postal & office & delivery | 07 Feb 2024 |
9 Sunlight Grove, Kenepuru, Porirua, 5022 | Registered | 15 Feb 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Matthew Robert Gunn
Churton Park, Wellington, 6037
Address used since 05 Apr 2023
Johnsonville, Wellington, 6037
Address used since 30 Jun 2022
Ascot Park, Porirua, 5024
Address used since 26 Jun 2021
Tawa, Wellington, 5028
Address used since 25 Oct 2013 |
Director | 27 Jan 2011 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
9 Sunlight Grove, Kenepuru, Porirua, 5022 | Registered | 15 Feb 2024 |
9 Sunlight Grove, Kenepuru, Porirua, 5022 | Service | 20 May 2024 |
8 Toporoa View , Ascot Park , Porirua , 5024 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
10 Sunlight Grove, Kenepuru, Porirua, 5022 | Service | 17 Apr 2023 - 20 May 2024 |
2/25 Kitchener Terrace, Johnsonville, Wellington, 6013 | Registered & service | 08 Jul 2022 - 17 Apr 2023 |
8 Toporoa View, Ascot Park, Porirua, 5024 | Registered & physical | 05 Jul 2021 - 08 Jul 2022 |
17 Franklyn Road, Tawa, Wellington, 5028 | Registered & physical | 27 Nov 2015 - 05 Jul 2021 |
Level 9, 49 Boulcott Street, Cbd, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 11 Nov 2014 - 27 Nov 2015 |
Level 7, 49 Boulcott Street, Cbd, Wellington, 6011 | Registered | 19 Jul 2013 - 11 Nov 2014 |
Level 7, 49 Boulcott Street, Cbd, Wellington, 6011 | Physical | 17 Jun 2013 - 11 Nov 2014 |
Level 10, 49 Boulcott Street, Cbd, Wellington, 6011 | Registered | 15 Feb 2012 - 19 Jul 2013 |
Level 10, 49 Boulcott Street, Cbd, Wellington, 6011 | Physical | 15 Feb 2012 - 17 Jun 2013 |
Level 4, 97-99 Courtenay Place, Te Aro, Wellington, 6142 | Physical & registered | 26 Sep 2011 - 15 Feb 2012 |
41a Pembroke Road, Northland, Wellington, 6012 | Registered & physical | 27 Jan 2011 - 26 Sep 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gunn, Matthew Robert Director |
Churton Park Wellington 6037 |
27 Jan 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hughes Robertson Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030803329 Company Number: 3718815 Entity |
Wellington Central Wellington 6011 |
15 May 2014 - 11 Aug 2021 |
Encom Industries Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031236928 Company Number: 3252151 Entity |
31 Jan 2014 - 15 May 2014 | |
Gunn, Malcolm Richard Individual |
Karori Wellington 6012 |
05 Apr 2011 - 20 Mar 2014 |
Encom Industries Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031236928 Company Number: 3252151 Entity |
31 Jan 2014 - 15 May 2014 | |
Gunn, Keri Lee Individual |
Tawa Wellington 5028 |
25 Feb 2011 - 11 Aug 2021 |
Gunn, Keri Lee Individual |
Tawa Wellington 5028 |
25 Feb 2011 - 11 Aug 2021 |
Gunn, Keri Lee Individual |
Tawa Wellington 5028 |
25 Feb 2011 - 11 Aug 2021 |
Hughes Robertson Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030803329 Company Number: 3718815 Entity |
Wellington Central Wellington 6011 |
15 May 2014 - 11 Aug 2021 |
Gunn, Andrew Richard Individual |
Karori Wellington 6012 |
10 Jun 2011 - 31 Jan 2014 |
Gunn, Gabrielle Jane Individual |
Karori Wellington 6012 |
05 Apr 2011 - 27 Mar 2014 |
Siufofoga Ole Laumua Trust 18 Wakefield Terrace |
|
Raukikini Limited 39 Franklyn Road |
|
Dpn Hutchison Holdings Limited 1 Franklyn Road |
|
Ngahauranga Te Kohanga Reo 55 Victory Crescent |
|
Gas Connections (wellington) Limited 57 Chester Road |
|
Sitiawan Limited 36 Hampton Hill Road |