Tugela Holdings Limited (NZBN 9429031173094) was started on 30 Mar 2011. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Ground Floor, 308 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 (type: registered, physical). Pricewaterhousecoopers, 109 Ward Street, Hamilton had been their physical address, up to 29 Aug 2022. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Carver, Richard George (a director) located at Rd 3, Hamilton postcode 3283,
Jones, Kevin Stuart (an individual) located at Belmont, Auckland postcode 0622. "Holding company operation - passive investment in subsidiary companies" (business classification K624030) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Tugela Holdings Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Ground Floor, 308 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 | Registered & physical & service | 29 Aug 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Richard George Carver
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 01 Apr 2016 |
Director | 30 Mar 2011 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Pricewaterhousecoopers, 109 Ward Street, Hamilton, 3240 | Physical & registered | 07 May 2014 - 29 Aug 2022 |
Level 8, Pricewaterhousecoopers Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 30 Mar 2011 - 07 May 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Carver, Richard George Director |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 |
30 Mar 2011 - current |
Jones, Kevin Stuart Individual |
Belmont Auckland 0622 |
30 Mar 2011 - current |
Milestone Builders Limited Pwc Centre, 109 Ward Street |
|
Nouvea Services Limited Pricewaterhousecoopers |
|
Pontarama Limited Level3, Pwc Centre |
|
The Magic Mountain Charitable Trust Offices Of Pricewaterhousecoopers |
|
Ata Rangi 2015 Limited Partnership Pricewaterhousecoopers |
|
Maa Bhagavati Enterprise Limited Shop 3, 109 Ward Street |
Cal Group Limited Level 3-pwc Centre |
Rob And John Limited Level 1 Caro House |
Gabelich Holdings Limited Level 1 Caro House |
Tdl No 2 Limited 6 Bryce Street |
Feisst Group Limited Level 10, Kpmg Centre |
Nwm Trustees 130 Limited 711 Victoria Street |