Showcase Software Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429031063814) was started on 13 Jun 2011. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1, 110 Main Street, Greytown, 5712 (type: registered, physical). Level 1, 19 Blair Street, Wellington had been their physical address, until 16 Jun 2020. 40019 shares are allocated to 24 shareholders who belong to 21 shareholder groups. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 78 shares (0.19 per cent of shares), namely:
Humphreys, Amanda Emily (an individual) located at Paraparaumu Beach, Paraparaumu, Wellington postcode 5032,
Humphreys, Nathan Lawrence (an individual) located at Paraparaumu Beach, Paraparaumu, Wellington postcode 5032. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.85 per cent of all shares (342 shares); it includes
Chris Harter & Jessica Harter (an other) - located at Atlanta, Georgia. Moving on to the next group of shareholders, share allocation (777 shares, 1.94%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Dam, Wouter Floris Van (an individual). "Computer software publishing" (business classification J542010) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Showcase Software Limited. Our data was last updated on 20 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 110 Main Street, Greytown, 5712 | Registered & physical & service | 16 Jun 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Adam Blackwell
Greytown, 5742
Address used since 01 Jun 2019
Te Aro, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 13 Jun 2011 |
Director | 13 Jun 2011 - current |
Melissa Rose Jocelyn
Greytown, 5712
Address used since 01 Dec 2015 |
Director | 13 Jun 2011 - current |
Melissa Rose Blackwell
Greytown, 5712
Address used since 01 Dec 2015 |
Director | 13 Jun 2011 - current |
Robert Clark
Khandallah, Wellington, 6035
Address used since 13 Feb 2013 |
Director | 13 Jun 2011 - 27 Oct 2019 |
Adrian Falvey
Petone, Lower Hutt, 5012
Address used since 13 Jun 2011 |
Director | 13 Jun 2011 - 05 Jun 2015 |
David Linstrom
Paraparaumu Beach, Paraparaumu, 5032
Address used since 01 Nov 2013 |
Director | 01 Nov 2013 - 20 Jul 2014 |
Level 1 , 110 Main Street , Greytown , 5712 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 19 Blair Street, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 05 May 2014 - 16 Jun 2020 |
Level 1, 24 Blair Street, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 12 Jun 2013 - 05 May 2014 |
Level 5, 203-209 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 13 Feb 2012 - 12 Jun 2013 |
14 Manchester Street, Petone, Wellington, 5012 | Physical & registered | 13 Jun 2011 - 13 Feb 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Humphreys, Amanda Emily Individual |
Paraparaumu Beach Paraparaumu Wellington 5032 |
02 Nov 2022 - current |
Humphreys, Nathan Lawrence Individual |
Paraparaumu Beach Paraparaumu Wellington 5032 |
02 Nov 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chris Harter & Jessica Harter Other (Other) |
Atlanta Georgia 30307 |
10 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dam, Wouter Floris Van Individual |
10 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ann Maureen Clark And Nicholas Hermanus Eveleans Atf C Karmal Trust Other (Other) |
Whakatane 3192 |
10 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dam, Sergio Andres Van Individual |
Brooklyn Wellington 6021 |
10 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mike Bennetts And Karen Bennetts Atf Kammjam Trust Other (Other) |
Wellington Central Wellington 6011 |
10 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jocelyn, Melissa Individual |
Greytown Wellington 5712 |
10 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Creative Hq Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031729987 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Te Aro Wellington 6011 |
21 Aug 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Keast, Geoffrey Individual |
East Denver Colorado 80220 |
10 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Falvey, Peter Individual |
Tahunanui Nelson 7011 |
10 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brooks, Jason Individual |
Kentfield California 94904 |
10 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Benjamin Caleb Field And Melanie Jane Field Other (Other) |
Birkenhead Auckland 0626 |
10 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tuckey, Paul Individual |
Wadestown Wellington 6012 |
10 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clark, Edward Individual |
10 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Barker Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038608193 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Wharewaka Taupo 3330 |
04 Jun 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Com Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031263436 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Roseneath Wellington 6011 |
04 Jun 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Falvey, Adrian Individual |
Wonthaggi Victoria 3995 |
10 Nov 2020 - current |
Adrian Falvey Director |
Brunswick Melbourne 3056 |
13 Jun 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clark, Adam Individual |
Greenlane Auckland 1051 |
10 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clark, Robert Individual |
Johnsonville Wellington 6037 |
10 Nov 2020 - current |
Robert Clark Director |
Johnsonville Wellington 6037 |
13 Jun 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Blackwell, Adam Director |
Greytown Wellington 5712 |
13 Jun 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wicksteed, Kim Individual |
Havelock North Hawke's Bay 4130 |
10 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Falvey, Peter Individual |
Tahunanui Nelson 7011 |
01 Nov 2012 - 10 Nov 2020 |
Humphreys, Nathan Lawrence And Amanda Emily Individual |
Johnsonville Wellington 6037 |
19 Oct 2022 - 02 Nov 2022 |
Clark, Robert Individual |
Johnsonville Wellington 6037 |
13 Jun 2011 - 10 Nov 2020 |
Barker Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038608193 Company Number: 647941 Entity |
Mount Maunganui |
01 Nov 2012 - 02 Jun 2022 |
Com Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031263436 Company Number: 3233287 Entity |
Plimmerton Porirua 5026 |
08 Oct 2014 - 02 Jun 2022 |
Humphreys, Nathan Lawrence Individual |
Johnsonville Wellington 6037 |
10 Nov 2020 - 19 Oct 2022 |
Jocelyn, Melissa Rose Director |
Greytown 5712 |
13 Jun 2011 - 10 Nov 2020 |
Humphreys, Nathan Lawrence Individual |
Johnsonville Wellington 6037 |
09 May 2014 - 10 Nov 2020 |
Keast, Geoffrey Individual |
25 Jun 2015 - 10 Nov 2020 | |
Com Investments Limited Other |
02 Jun 2022 - 04 Jun 2022 | |
Barker Holdings Limited Other |
02 Jun 2022 - 04 Jun 2022 | |
Com Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031263436 Company Number: 3233287 Entity |
Plimmerton Porirua 5026 |
08 Oct 2014 - 02 Jun 2022 |
Barker Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038608193 Company Number: 647941 Entity |
Mount Maunganui |
01 Nov 2012 - 02 Jun 2022 |
Clark, Adam Individual |
Greenlane Auckland 1051 |
03 Oct 2014 - 10 Nov 2020 |
Van Dam, Wouter Floris Individual |
21 Jul 2015 - 10 Nov 2020 | |
Bennetts As Kammjam Trust, Mike And Karen Individual |
Wellington Central Wellington 6011 |
03 Oct 2014 - 10 Nov 2020 |
Van Dam, Sergio Andres Individual |
Brooklyn Wellington 6021 |
03 Oct 2014 - 10 Nov 2020 |
Harter, Chris And Jessica Individual |
Atlanta, Ga 30307 |
04 Aug 2015 - 10 Nov 2020 |
Kirkland, Darren Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
27 Nov 2012 - 06 Feb 2015 |
Tuckey, Paul Individual |
Wadestown Wellington 6012 |
21 Apr 2013 - 10 Nov 2020 |
Wicksteed, Kim Individual |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
03 Oct 2014 - 10 Nov 2020 |
Brooks, Jason Individual |
California |
11 Jun 2015 - 10 Nov 2020 |
Clark, Edward Individual |
01 Nov 2012 - 10 Nov 2020 | |
Benjamin Caleb Field And Melanie Jane Field Other |
Birkenhead Auckland 0626 |
09 May 2014 - 10 Nov 2020 |
Ann Maureen Clark And Nicholas Hermanus Eveleans As C.karmal Trust Other |
Rd 2 Whakatane 3192 |
01 Nov 2012 - 10 Nov 2020 |
Falvey, Adrian Individual |
Brunswick Melbourne 3056 |
13 Jun 2011 - 10 Nov 2020 |
Knowles, Sam Individual |
Kelburn Wellington 6012 |
03 Oct 2014 - 08 Oct 2014 |
Nicole Linstrom, Mike Wilson And David Linstrom Other |
28 Jan 2014 - 24 Jul 2014 | |
Null - Nicole Linstrom, Mike Wilson And David Linstrom Other |
28 Jan 2014 - 24 Jul 2014 |
Moxie Communications Limited 24 Blair Street |
|
Virtual Expos NZ Limited Level 1 |
|
Shrew Enterprises Limited 24 Blair St |
|
Family Lawyers Limited 24 Blair Street |
|
Youdo Limited Level 2 |
|
Thompson Bros Holdings Limited 20 Blair Str |
Seekom Limited Level 2 |
Wip App Limited 12 Allen Street |
Xero Limited 19-23 Taranaki St, Te Aro |
Supraliminal Gaming Limited Apartment 506, 19 College Street |
Quantate Limited 1/20 Egmont Street |
Smb Labs Limited 4 Bond Street |