Farmer Fred Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429031060196) was started on 13 Jun 2011. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 147 Mahoe Street, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 (type: registered, physical). 1 Carlton Street, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu had been their registered address, up until 01 Jul 2022. 1000 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (5 per cent of shares), namely:
Hayes, Frederick Joseph (an individual) located at Rd 1, Taupiri postcode 3791. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 95 per cent of all shares (950 shares); it includes
Fairhall, Kelvyn Wallace (a director) - located at Waihi,
Hayes, Frederick Joseph (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Taupiri. "Milk production - dairy cattle" (ANZSIC A016020) is the classification the ABS issued Farmer Fred Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
147 Mahoe Street, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 | Registered & physical & service | 01 Jul 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Fredrick Joseph Hayes
Rd 1, Taupiri, 3791
Address used since 13 Jun 2011 |
Director | 13 Jun 2011 - current |
Frederick Joseph Hayes
Rd 1, Taupiri, 3791
Address used since 13 Jun 2011 |
Director | 13 Jun 2011 - current |
Kelvyn Wallace Fairhall
Waihi, 3610
Address used since 18 Jul 2018 |
Director | 18 Jul 2018 - current |
Catherine Eloise Hayes
Rd 1, Hamilton, 3791
Address used since 03 Sep 2020 |
Director | 03 Sep 2020 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1 Carlton Street, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 | Registered & physical | 18 May 2022 - 01 Jul 2022 |
147 Mahoe Street, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 | Registered & physical | 03 May 2022 - 18 May 2022 |
1 Carlton Street, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 | Registered & physical | 01 Sep 2021 - 03 May 2022 |
411 Greenhill Drive, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 | Registered & physical | 04 Sep 2019 - 01 Sep 2021 |
Level 3 - Pwc Centre, Cnr Ward & (109)anglesea Streets, Hamilton, 3204 | Registered & physical | 08 Jul 2016 - 04 Sep 2019 |
31 Reservoir Road, Waihi, Waihi, 3610 | Physical & registered | 13 Jun 2011 - 08 Jul 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hayes, Frederick Joseph Individual |
Rd 1 Taupiri 3791 |
26 Aug 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fairhall, Kelvyn Wallace Director |
Waihi 3610 |
02 Dec 2019 - current |
Hayes, Frederick Joseph Individual |
Rd 1 Taupiri 3791 |
26 Aug 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hayes, Fredrick Joseph Director |
Rd 1 Taupiri 3791 |
13 Jun 2011 - 26 Aug 2019 |
Mistry & Sons Limited Level 3, Pwc Centre |
|
Square Cheese Limited Level 3 - Pwc Centre |
|
Rgm Plant Limited Level 3, Pwc Centre |
|
Parklands Runoff Limited Level 3, Pwc Centre |
|
D J Rydon Limited Level 3, Pwc Centre |
|
Boulder Creek Hydro Limited Level 3 - Pwc Centre |
J & V Roskam Farms Limited Level 10, Kpmg Centre |
Cranleigh Downs Trust Limited Level 11, Kpmg Centre |
Te Pua Dairies Limited 10th Floor, Kpmg Centre |
Kaimarama Farming Limited 7th Floor |
Dc Farms Limited Level 3 |
North End Farms Limited 37c Harwood Street |